This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2019 at 07:17:14 (UTC).

In Re In the Matter of the Application of Lufthansa Technik AG, Petitioner, for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 to Take Discovery, Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, of Respondent

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 In Re In the Matter of the Application of Lufthansa Technik AG, Petitioner, for an Order Pursuant to 28 U S C 1782 to Take Discovery, Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, of Respondent was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-MC-00016

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lufthansa Technik AG

Respondent

Thales Avionics, Inc.

Intervenor

Astronics Advanced Electronic Systems Corp.

In Re

In the Matter of the Application of Lufthansa Technik AG, Petitioner, for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alexis Adian Smith

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2300

Lawrence D Rosenberg

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Respondent Attorneys

Ronald D Kent

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

4675 Macarthur Court Suite 1250

Newport Beach, CA 92660

William Thomas O'Brien

Attorney at Dentons LLP

1900 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Intervenor Attorneys

Jennifer L Brockett

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

Benjamin M Daniels

Attorney at Wiggin and Dana LLP

One Century Tower, 265 Church Street

New Haven, CT 06508

 

Court Documents

#38

RESTRICTED

#37

(#37) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Intervenor Astronics Advanced Electronic Systems Corp. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Lisa Hernandez at lisahernandez@dwt.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Brockett, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#36

(#36) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Respondent Thales Avionics, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Linda Ainsworth at linda.ainsworth@dentons.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Kent, Ronald) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#35

(#35) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Petitioner Lufthansa Technik AG for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Alexis Smith at asmith@jonesday.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#34

(#34) MINUTES OF Hearing re Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. #15 ) and Motion to Intervene (Dkt. #18 ) held before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Case is called. Counsel state their appearances. Also present are counsel for Intervenor, Jennifer Brockett and Benjamin Daniels. As to the Motion to Intervene (Dkt. #18 ), oral arguments are heard. The Court grants this Motion as stated on the record. As to the Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. #15 ), oral arguments are heard. The Court sets the matter for a further hearing on Thursday, August 29, 2019, at 3:30pm. Counsel may appear either in person or by telephone. Petitioner shall file a status report on August 28, 2019. Court Recorder: CS 8/14/19. (sbou) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

33 #1

Exhibit A-B

#33

(#33) REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #18 filed by Intervenor Astronics Advanced Electronic Systems Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Brockett, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#18

(#33) REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #18 filed by Intervenor Astronics Advanced Electronic Systems Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Brockett, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#15

(#31) REPLY in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #11 #15 filed by Respondent Thales Avionics, Inc.. (Kent, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#2

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG, re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence D. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Lufthansa Technik AG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24007149) #4 served on July 1, 2019. (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

1 #7

Proposed Order Order Granting Application

1 #6

Declaration of Alexis Smith

1 #5

Proposed Order Protective Order

1 #4

Proposed Subpoena

1 #3

Declaration of Alastair McCulloch

1 #2

Declaration of Thomas Bouvet

1 #1

Declaration of Gerd Jaekel

#1

(#10) APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG. (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/14/19 2:03 P.M. re Transcript #38 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/14/19 2:03 P.M.. Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019. (clo) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Intervenor Astronics Advanced Electronic Systems Corp. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Lisa Hernandez at lisahernandez@dwt.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Brockett, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Respondent Thales Avionics, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Linda Ainsworth at linda.ainsworth@dentons.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Kent, Ronald) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Petitioner Lufthansa Technik AG for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Alexis Smith at asmith@jonesday.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MINUTES OF Hearing re Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. #15 ) and Motion to Intervene (Dkt. #18 ) held before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Case is called. Counsel state their appearances. Also present are counsel for Intervenor, Jennifer Brockett and Benjamin Daniels. As to the Motion to Intervene (Dkt. #18 ), oral arguments are heard. The Court grants this Motion as stated on the record. As to the Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. #15 ), oral arguments are heard. The Court sets the matter for a further hearing on Thursday, August 29, 2019, at 3:30pm. Counsel may appear either in person or by telephone. Petitioner shall file a status report on August 28, 2019. Court Recorder: CS 8/14/19. (sbou) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #18 filed by Intervenor Astronics Advanced Electronic Systems Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Brockett, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney William T. O'Brien APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thales Avionics, Inc., designating Ronald D. Kent as local counsel. (sbou) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) REPLY in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #11 #15 filed by Respondent Thales Avionics, Inc.. (Kent, Ronald) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William T. OBrien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Respondent Thales Avionics, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24228371) filed by Respondent Thales Avionics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Kent, Ronald) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG. (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence D. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Lufthansa Technik AG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/28/2019, Receipt No. 097324007149) filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence D. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Lufthansa Technik AG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24007149) #4 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG, re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence D. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Lufthansa Technik AG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24007149) #4 served on July 1, 2019. (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The filing fee for this case type is $47.00. Form G-23 can be e-filed on this case to request a refund. (car) Modified on 7/1/2019 (car). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence D. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Lufthansa Technik AG (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24007149) filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LR 7.1-1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG, identifying Deutsche Lufthansa AG. (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG. (Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION For Discovery In Aid of Foreign Litigation Pursuant to 28 USC Section 1782 Receipt No: 0973-24006882 - Fee: $400, filed by Movant Lufthansa Technik AG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerd Jaekel, #2 Declaration of Thomas Bouvet, #3 Declaration of Alastair McCulloch, #4 Proposed Subpoena, #5 Proposed Order Protective Order, #6 Declaration of Alexis Smith, #7 Proposed Order Order Granting Application) (Attorney Alexis Adian Smith added to party Lufthansa Technik AG(pty:mov))(Smith, Alexis) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THALES AVIONICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Lorraine Brockett