This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 15:58:41 (UTC).

Ludwig v. Strubin

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Ludwig filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Strubin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01274

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loriann Ludwig

Defendant

Raymond G. Strubin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sammy Sugiura

Attorney at Cohen & Grace, LLC

105 Braunlich Drive, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15237

Mark Grace

Attorney at Cohen & Grace

105 Braunlich Drive, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15237

Defendant Attorney

Michele J. McDonald

Attorney at State of Maryland Office of the Attorney General

200 St. Paul Pl, 20Th Fl

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Raymond G. Strubin answer due 9/9/2021.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/23/2021. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion by Raymond G. Strubin (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Michele) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loriann Ludwig. (Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loriann Ludwig. Raymond G. Strubin waiver sent on 5/25/2021, answer due 7/26/2021.(Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 05/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Raymond G. Strubin.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Raymond G. Strubin ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9291955.), filed by Loriann Ludwig. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sammy Y. Sugiura