This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2020 at 08:06:20 (UTC).

Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC v. HUB International Limited et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HUB International Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01110

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC

Defendants

The Hartford Fire Insurance Company

HUB International Limited

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carl Kessinger

Attorney at Holland Law Firm

300 North Tucker Blvd., Suite 801

St. Louis, MO 63101

Ann E. Callis

Attorney at Holland Law Firm, LLC

1324 Niedringhaus Ave. Suite B

Granite City, IL 62040

R. Seth Crompton

Attorney at Holland, Groves, et al.

300 North Tucker Boulevard, Suite 801

St. Louis, MO 63101

Robert J. Evola

Attorney at SL Chapman LLC

330 North Fourth Street, Suite 330

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick J. Kenny

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Rostyslaw J. Smyk

Attorney at Ruberry, Stalmack & Garvey, LLC

10 South Lasalle Street, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E. Callis on behalf of Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC (Callis, Ann) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Ann Callis does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Callis, Ann) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Callis, Ann) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Kessinger on behalf of Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC (Kessinger, Carl) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Evola on behalf of Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC (Evola, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by R. Seth Crompton on behalf of Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC (Crompton, R.) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1110-NJR. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Hartford Fire Insurance Company answer due 11/17/2020. (kek) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ALLOWS Hartford Fire Insurance Company up to and including November 17, 2020 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 10/27/2020. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing HUB International Limited to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to HUB International Limited on 10/27/2020. Consent due by 11/17/2020 (kek) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Rostyslaw J. Smyk on behalf of HUB International Limited (Smyk, Rostyslaw) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Lucky Lincoln Gaming LLC, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1110-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 11/12/2020 (kek) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by The Hartford Fire Insurance Company to Plaintiff (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for The Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Kenny on behalf of The Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison County, case number 2020L 001180 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4314708), filed by The Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Kenny, Patrick) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUB International LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rostyslaw J. Smyk

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J. Kenny