This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:42:36 (UTC).

Luckadue v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Luckadue filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia S. Harris and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia S. Harris

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Latriece Luckadue

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin W. Long

Attorney at Martin W. Long, Attorney at Law

Post Office Box 2333

Wylie, TX 75098

Defendant Attorney

Stacey Elise McCord

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/6/2020. (ljb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Latriece Luckadue. Social Security Administration served on 1/27/2020. (Long, Martin) (Entered: 02/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Laura Latriece Luckadue Consent To Magistrate Judge (Long, Martin) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (ljb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/6/2020. (ljb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Laura Latriece Luckadue. (ljb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Laura Latriece Luckadue. (ljb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Laura Latriece Luckadue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Latriece Luckadue. (ljb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.