This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 11:26:03 (UTC).

Lucero v. Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 Lucero filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00363

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

Presiding Judge

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leonardo Lucero

Santa Fe, NM 87504-1059

Defendants

Centurion Ltd

Betty Judd

FNU LNU

Jane and John Does

Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen F. Lawless

Attorney at Stephen F. Lawless, PA

201 Third Street Nw, Ste 500

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew J Stackpole

Attorney at Park & Associates LLC

3840 Masthead Street Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Alfred A Park

Attorney at Park & Associates, LLC

3840 Masthead St., N.E.

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Daniel P Struck

Attorney at Struck Love Bojanowski & Acedo, PLC

3100 West Ray Road, Suite 300

Chandler, AZ 85226

Deborah D. Wells

Attorney at Kennedy, Moulton & Wells PC

2201 San Pedro Ne, Building 3, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Jacob B Lee

Attorney at Struck Love Bojanowski & Acedo, PLC

3100 West Ray Road, Suite 300

Chandler, AZ 85226

Debra J. Moulton

Attorney at Kennedy, Moulton & Wells PC

2201 San Pedro Ne, Building 3, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen F. Lawless on behalf of Leonardo Lucero (Lawless, Stephen) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Amended Complaint, filed by Centurion Ltd. (Stackpole, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Stay and Screen Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Re: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 11) by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Leonardo Lucero (meq) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Compel Court to Appoint Counsel by Leonardo Lucero. (meq) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Leonardo Lucero. (meq) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Leonardo Lucero. (meq) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob B Lee on behalf of Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC of Filing State Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Park, Alfred) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred A Park on behalf of Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Park, Alfred) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6394368 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Park, Alfred) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen F. Lawless on behalf of Leonardo Lucero (Lawless, Stephen) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Amended Complaint, filed by Centurion Ltd. (Stackpole, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Stay and Screen Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Re: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 11) by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE by Leonardo Lucero (meq) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Compel Court to Appoint Counsel by Leonardo Lucero. (meq) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Leonardo Lucero. (meq) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Leonardo Lucero. (meq) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Trial by Leonardo Lucero. (meq) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah D. Wells on behalf of Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd (Wells, Deborah) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Stay and Screen Complaint by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd. (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob B Lee on behalf of Core Civic NW New Mexico Correctional Facility, Betty Judd (Lee, Jacob) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC of Filing State Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Park, Alfred) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred A Park on behalf of Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Park, Alfred) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6394368 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Park, Alfred) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-00621. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Park, Alfred) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen F. Lawless