This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 07:42:37 (UTC).

Luce et al v. Kelly et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Luce filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kelly. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01250

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.

Nicholas A. Luce

David M. Rice

Jerry J. Robinson

Joseph R. Stacho

Illinois State Rifle Association

Defendants

Jarod Ingebrigtsen

Brendan F. Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David G. Sigale

Attorney at Law Firm of David G. Sigale, P.C.

430 West Roosevelt Road

Wheaton, IL 60187

Gregory Abbott Bedell

33 North Dearborn Street, 10Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Leigh Kozar

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph St., Floor 13

Chicago, IL 60601

Mary Alice Johnston

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General

100 West Randolph Street, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Notice of Filing

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 5/10/21. The deadline of 5/17/21 for parties to file a joint initial status report is re-set to 5/24/21. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendants Jarod Ingebrigtsen, Brendan F. Kelly for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (UNOPPOSED) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Johnston, Mary) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jarod Ingebrigtsen, Brendan F. Kelly by Mary Alice Johnston (Johnston, Mary) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jarod Ingebrigtsen, Brendan F. Kelly by Amanda Leigh Kozar (Kozar, Amanda) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 5/17/21, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Jarod Ingebrigtsen, Brendan F. Kelly (txl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Nicholas A. Luce, David M. Rice, Jerry J. Robinson, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Joseph R. Stacho by Gregory Abbott Bedell (Bedell, Gregory) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Jerry J. Robinson, Nicholas A. Luce, David M. Rice, Joseph R. Stacho, Illinois State Rifle Association; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17992611.(Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Rifle Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Second Amendment Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Alice Johnston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Leigh Kozar