This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:13:48 (UTC).

Lucchesi-Bizzotto v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Lucchesi-Bizzotto filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judge overseeing this case is David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01796

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer G Mrozik

Attorney at Hoglund, Chwialkowski & Mrozik, PLLC

1781 W Cty Rd B

Roseville, MN 55113

Dana W Duncan

Attorney at Duncan Disability Law, S.C.

555 Birch St

Nekoosa, WI 54457

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/19/2020. (TJB) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. Andrew Saul served on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (MTP) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. Andrew Saul served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Duncan, Dana) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (CLK) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/19/2020. (TJB) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dana W Duncan for Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/19/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-1796 DTS. (MMG) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana W. Duncan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7977829 filed by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. (Mrozik, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. (Mrozik, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul filed by Anna Lucchesi-Bizzotto. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR Summons and Complaint Atty General, #2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR Summons and Complaint RCC, #3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR Summons and Complaint US Atty, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mrozik, Jennifer) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less