This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2021 at 07:02:44 (UTC).

Lucchese v. Kone, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Lucchese filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Kone, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00895

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Lucchese

Defendant

Kone, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victoria Bree Rivapalacio

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Norman B. Blumenthal

Attorney at Blumenthal, Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Kyle R Nordrehaug

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug and Bhowmik

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Aparajit Bhowmik

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Piya Mukherjee

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Charlotte Elise James

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorneys

Edwin Mendelson Boniske

Attorney at Higgs Fletcher and Mack LLP

401 West A Street, Suite 2600

San Diego, CA 92101-7913

Kyle William Nageotte

Attorney at Higgs Fletcher & Mack, LLP

401 West A Street Suite 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#14

(#14) Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/22/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

9 #1

Proof of Service

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kone, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Boniske, Edwin) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Elise James (James, Charlotte) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Piya Mukherjee (Mukherjee, Piya) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Bree Rivapalacio (Rivapalacio, Victoria) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/30/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

3 #1

Proof of Service

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Kone, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Boniske, Edwin) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#14

(#13) ORDER RELATING CASE. Motions terminated: (13 in 4:21-cv-00889-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Matthew Lucchese, Julio chavez, Kone, Inc., Julio Chavez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Declaration of Edwin M. Boniske

1 #4

Exhibit D

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-588227. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15535286). Filed byKone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Edwin M. Boniske, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proof of Service)(Boniske, Edwin) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER RELATING CASE. Motions terminated: (13 in 4:21-cv-00889-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Matthew Lucchese, Julio chavez, Kone, Inc., Julio Chavez. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/22/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kone, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Boniske, Edwin) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Elise James (James, Charlotte) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Piya Mukherjee (Mukherjee, Piya) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Bree Rivapalacio (Rivapalacio, Victoria) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 4/30/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/19/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Kone, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Boniske, Edwin) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using C ivil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kone, Inc. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Kone, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kone Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Kone, Inc., Other Affiliate Matthew Lucchese for Kone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Boniske, Edwin) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-588227. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15535286). Filed byKone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Edwin M. Boniske, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proof of Service)(Boniske, Edwin) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KONE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman B Blumenthal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charlotte James