This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2020 at 08:06:43 (UTC).

Lucas v. Sportradar, US et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Lucas filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Sportradar, US. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tony N. Leung and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00602

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cody Lucas

Defendants

Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP

MLB Advanced Media, LP

Houston Astros, LLC

Major League Baseball

Sportradar, US

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca A. Peterson

Robert K Shelquist

Paul Geske

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren A. Moskowitz

Michael T. Reynolds

Aaron D Van Oort

Katherine Forrest

Rory Collins

Benjamin Walker

Tyler Mathew Dato

John Louis Hardiman

Hannah Lonky Fackler

Hilary Preston

Todd A Noteboom

Calvin P Hoffman

Aalok Kumar Sharma

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin Walker for MLB Advanced Media, LP and for Major League Baseball; granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Hannah Lonky Fackler for MLB Advanced Media, LP and for Major League Baseball; granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Louis Hardiman for MLB Advanced Media, LP and for Major League Baseball; granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tyler Mathew Dato for MLB Advanced Media, LP and for Major League Baseball. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/3/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tyler M. Dato. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610184 filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John L. Hardiman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610176 filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hannah L. Fackler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610162 filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin R. Walker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7610127 filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER on #21 Stipulation. Sportradar US LLC has until May 8, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/31/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation. (Sharma, Aalok) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Sportradar, US. Jointly Signed by Cody Lucas. (Sharma, Aalok) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susan Richard Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-602 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/25/2020. (KDS) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Nancy E. Brasel recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-602 SRN/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/25/2020. (KDS) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hilary L. Preston. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7555771 filed by Houston Astros, LLC. (Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Collins on behalf of Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Collins, Rory) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D Van Oort on behalf of Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball. (Van Oort, Aaron) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul Geske for Cody Lucas. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/4/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul T. Geske. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7524348 filed by Cody Lucas. (Shelquist, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Eric C. Tostrud recused. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-602 NEB/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/27/2020. (KDS) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Myles McGuire; Paul T. Geske; Eugene Y. Turin; Timothy P. Kingsbury as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball, Sportradar, US. (lmb) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-602 (ECT/TNL). (lmb) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Red Sox Baseball Club, LP, Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, LP, Major League Baseball, Sportradar, US (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7511518) filed by Cody Lucas. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shelquist, Robert) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less