This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2020 at 07:30:20 (UTC).

Lucas v. Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 Lucas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Boh Bros Construction Co , L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13434

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elihu Lucas

Defendant

Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erin B. Saucier

Attorney at Didriksen, Saucier & Woods, PLC (New Orleans)

3114 Canal St.

New Orleans, LA 70119

Carl Allen Woods, III

Attorney at Didriksen, Saucier & Woods, PLC (New Orleans)

3114 Canal St.

New Orleans, LA 70119

Alexander Arthur Lauricella

Attorney at Didriksen, Saucier & Woods, PLC (New Orleans)

3114 Canal St.

New Orleans, LA 70119

Alphonse Mandar Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at Al M. Thompson, Jr., LLC

365 Canal St., Suite 2960

New Orleans, LA 70130

Caleb H. Didriksen, III

Attorney at Didriksen, Saucier & Woods, PLC (New Orleans)

3114 Canal St.

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Michael R.C. Riess

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Charles Bruce Colvin

Attorney at Riess LeMieux, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1100

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

8 #6

Exhibit 6

8 #5

Exhibit 5

8 #4

Exhibit 4

8 #3

Exhibit 3

8 #2

Exhibit 2

8 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

#7

6 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

#5

#4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Notice of 28 U.S.c. 1447(b) Compliance

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C. re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Riess, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE cancelling scheduling conference. By Clerk.(jrc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Elihu Lucas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Didriksen, Caleb) Modified docket text on 12/16/2019 to correct submission date (ajn). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2019 2:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C..(Riess, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C. (pp) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-0860 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7938217) filed by Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Notice of 28 U.S.c. 1447(b) Compliance, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Michael R.C. Riess added to party Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Riess, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C. is a litigant