This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2021 at 07:05:30 (UTC).

Luc Burbon v. Arovast Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Luc Burbon filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Arovast Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06148

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luc Burbon

Defendant

Arovast Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradly Gurion Marks

Attorney at The Marks Law Firm, PC

175 Varick Street, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10014

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luc Burbon. Arovast Corporation served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/18/2021. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Arovast Corporation. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Arovast Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13861571 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Luc Burbon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luc Burbon. Arovast Corporation served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/18/2021. (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Arovast Corporation. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Arovast Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13861571 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Luc Burbon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marks, Bradly) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arovast Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradly Gurion Marks