This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:58:27 (UTC).

Lubinski v. Colvin

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Lubinski filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Colvin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan E. Schwab. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01485

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan E. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph W. Lubinski

Defendants

Carolyn W. Colvin

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

F. Michael Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Friedman

Po Box 467

Drexel Hill, PA 19026

Defendant Attorney

Timothy S. Judge

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Civil Litigation Units

William J. Nealon Federal Building And U.S. Courthouse, 235 N. Washington Avenue

Scranton, PA 18507

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting pltf's app #2 to proceed IFP, deeming complaint filed, directing Clrk of Ct to issue process to USM who is directed to serve pltf's complaint in acc w/ FRCP 4(i) w/in 14 days, & directing that deft shall serve & file an answer w/ a certified copy of the transcript of the administrative record w/in 60 days of service of the complaint. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/24/20. (ki) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 08/20/20. (pjr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Atty eneral rec'd on 9/21/20. (ao) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew Saul served on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (ao) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Judge on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Judge, Timothy) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ki) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting pltf's app #2 to proceed IFP, deeming complaint filed, directing Clrk of Ct to issue process to USM who is directed to serve pltf's complaint in acc w/ FRCP 4(i) w/in 14 days, & directing that deft shall serve & file an answer w/ a certified copy of the transcript of the administrative record w/in 60 days of service of the complaint. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/24/20. (ki) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 08/20/20. (pjr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph W. Lubinski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(pjr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Joseph W. Lubinski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less