This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 07:57:44 (UTC).

Lu v. Hyper Bicycles, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Lu filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hyper Bicycles, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11739

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Fa-Hsing Lu

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Hyper Bicycles, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Christopher E. Hultquist

Attorney at Hultquist Law, P.C.

56 Pine Street, Suite 200

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brendan M. Shortell

Attorney at Lambert & Associates

92 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Lawrence Ecoff

Attorney at ECOFF CAMPAIN & TILLES, LLP

280 South Beverly Drive, Suite 504

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Gary E. Lambert

Attorney at Lambert Shortell & Connaughton

92 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

12 #9

Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. D549,843

12 #8

Exhibit 8 - U.S. Patent No. D549,842

12 #7

Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. D342,702

12 #6

Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. D291,292

12 #5

Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. D281,615

12 #4

Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. D526249

12 #3

Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. D510892

12 #2

Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. D501431

12 #1

Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. D482639

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Fa-Hsing Lu by Hyper Bicycles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. D482639, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. D501431, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. D510892, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. D526249, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. D281,615, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. D291,292, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. D342,702, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Patent No. D549,842, #9 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. D549,843)(Shortell, Brendan) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawrence C. Ecoff Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8496355 by Hyper Bicycles, Inc..(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit 6, Category Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5, Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hyper Bicycles, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8430701 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fa-Hsing Lu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6, Category Sheet)(Hultquist, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Fa-Hsing Lu by Hyper Bicycles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. D482639, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. D501431, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. D510892, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. D526249, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. D281,615, #6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. D291,292, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. D342,702, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Patent No. D549,842, #9 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. D549,843)(Shortell, Brendan) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lawrence C. Ecoff. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawrence C. Ecoff Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8496355 by Hyper Bicycles, Inc..(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan M. Shortell on behalf of Hyper Bicycles, Inc. (Shortell, Brendan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#8) Set/Reset Deadlines: Hyper Bicycles, Inc. 11/19/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: ALLOWING #6 Motion for Extension of Time. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 19, 2020 to Respond to Complaint by Hyper Bicycles, Inc..(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Hultquist, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Hyper Bicycles, Inc. served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Hultquist, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hyper Bicycles, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hyper Bicycles, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8430701 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fa-Hsing Lu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6, Category Sheet)(Hultquist, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYPER BICYCLES INC. A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Ervery Lambert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan M. Shortell