This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 07:55:19 (UTC).

Lu v. Davis et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Lu filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11968

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Friedrich Lu

Boston, MA 02112

Defendants

Anderson & Kreiger LLP

Dominic Blue

Nina Pickering-Cook

Sarah St. Pierre

Irwin Driggs

Sonya Skinner

Kevin Davis

Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority

Tyler Ostholthoff

Stephanie Pollack

Massachusetts State Courts

Betsy Taylor

Christina Marshall

Boston, MA 02109

Steve Poftak

ABM Janitorial Services Northeast, inc

David S Mackey

Joseph Sullivan

Dean Mazzarella

Luis Manuel Ramirez

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Christina S. Marshall

Attorney at Anderson & Kreiger LLP

Suite 2100, 50 Milk Street

Boston, MA 02109

Amy B. Bratskeir

Attorney at MBTA Legal Department

10 Park Plaza, Suite 7760

Boston, MA 02116

Phoebe Fischer-Groban

Attorney at Massachusetts Attorney General's Office

One Ashburton Place, Mccormack Building, 20Th Floor

Boston, MA 02108-1598

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MOTION to Strike #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Friedrich Lu.(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#12) Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Per FRCP 12(b)(5) and 41(b) filed by Friedrich Lu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#11

(#11) Opposition re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Kevin Davis, Frank DePaola, Irwin Driggs, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Tyler Ostholthoff, Steve Poftak, Luis Manuel Ramirez, Representatives at CharlieCard Support Services, Sonya Skinner, Sarah St. Pierre. (Bratskeir, Amy) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Per FRCP 12(b)(5) and 41(b) by Massachusetts State Courts.(Fischer-Groban, Phoebe) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#9

(#9) Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Per FRCP 41(b) filed by Friedrich Lu. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Entry of Default by Friedrich Lu.(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anderson & Kreiger LLP, David S Mackey, Christina Marshall, Nina Pickering-Cook.(Marshall, Christina) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

6 #4

Exh. 3 - 2019 Order (J. Saylor)

6 #3

Exh. 2 - 2017 Order (J. Saylor)

6 #2

Exh. 1 - 2002 Order (J. Wolf)

6 #1

MBTA Memo in Supp MTD

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Plaintiff's Motion for Identity and Location of a Certain Defendant by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Friedrich Lu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Strike #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Friedrich Lu.(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Per FRCP 12(b)(5) and 41(b) filed by Friedrich Lu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Opposition re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Kevin Davis, Frank DePaola, Irwin Driggs, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Tyler Ostholthoff, Steve Poftak, Luis Manuel Ramirez, Representatives at CharlieCard Support Services, Sonya Skinner, Sarah St. Pierre. (Bratskeir, Amy) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss Per FRCP 12(b)(5) and 41(b) by Massachusetts State Courts.(Fischer-Groban, Phoebe) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Per FRCP 41(b) filed by Friedrich Lu. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Entry of Default by Friedrich Lu.(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anderson & Kreiger LLP, David S Mackey, Christina Marshall, Nina Pickering-Cook.(Marshall, Christina) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss Per FRCP 41(b) by Kevin Davis, Frank DePaola, Irwin Driggs, Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority, Tyler Ostholthoff, Steve Poftak, Luis Manuel Ramirez, Representatives at CharlieCard Support Services, Sonya Skinner, Sarah St. Pierre. (Attachments: #1 MBTA Memo in Supp MTD, #2 Exh. 1 - 2002 Order (J. Wolf), #3 Exh. 2 - 2017 Order (J. Saylor), #4 Exh. 3 - 2019 Order (J. Saylor))(Bratskeir, Amy) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically shall download this summons, complete one for each defendant, and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Plaintiff's Motion for Identity and Location of a Certain Defendant by Friedrich Lu.(Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Friedrich Lu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM Janitorial Services Northeast, inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Anderson & Kreiger LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phoebe Fischer-Groban