This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2021 at 06:53:54 (UTC).

LSP Products Group Inc v Oatey Co

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 LSP Products Group Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Oatey Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara M.G. Lynn and Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00642

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Barbara M.G. Lynn

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LSP Products Group, Inc.

LSP Products Group Inc

Defendants

Oatey Co.

Oatey Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie Rene Barnes

Attorney at Plunk Smith, PLLC

4949 Hedgcoxe Road, Suite 230

Plano, TX 75024

Elizabeth Siebman Forrest

Attorney at Siebman Forrest Burg & Smith LLP

4949 Hedgcoxe Road, Suite 230

Plano, TX 75024

Scott P Amy

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer

3200 Windy Hill Road Se, Suite 1600E

Atlanta, GA 30339

Eric Gregory Maurer

Attorney at Thomas | Horstemeyer LLP

3200 Windy Hill Road Se, Suite 1600E

Atlanta, GA 30339

Michael C Smith

Attorney at Siebman Forrest Burg & Smith LLP

4949 Hedgcoxe Road, Suite 230

Plano, TX 75024

Clyde Moody Siebman

Attorney at Siebman Forrest Burg & Smith, LLP

300 N. Travis St., Suite 230

Sherman, TX 75090

Andrea N Bonner

Attorney at Thomas Horstmeyer LLP

3200 Windy Hill Road Se, Suite 1600E

Atlanta, GA 30339

Anna Rebecca Skupin

Attorney at Siebman, Forrest, Burg & Smith LLP

300 North Travis Street

Sherman, TX 75092

Wesley A Roberts

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer LLP

3200 Windy Hill Road Se, Suite 1600E

Atlanta, GA 30339

Joseph W Staley

Attorney at Thomas Horstemeyer LLP

3200 Windy Hill Road Se, Suite 1600E

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey A Tinker

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

David N Farsiou

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

2929 Arch Street, 12Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

Gary Levin

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

2929 Arch Street, Cira Centre - 12Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Tammy Swinney Wood

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

Jeffrey S Lowenstein

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

James Byron Hatten

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1170 Peachtree Street, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30309-7676

James H Rollinson

Attorney at Baker &n Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Robert P Leeson

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LP

2929 Arch Street, 12Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19104

 

Court Documents

#129

(#129) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#128

(#128) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re: #127 Order by LSP Products Group Inc. (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#127

(#127) Letter from the Court to Counsel Regarding Settlement; dismissal papers due 3/29/2021. (Signed by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/3/2021) (twd) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#126

(#126) NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Stay filed by LSP Products Group Inc (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

125 #6

Additional Page(s)

125 #5

Additional Page(s)

125 #2

Additional Page(s)

125 #1

Additional Page(s)

#125

(#125) Appendix in Support filed by LSP Products Group Inc re #124 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s), #6 Additional Page(s)) (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 01/23/2021)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case filed by LSP Products Group Inc. (Barnes, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LSP Products Group Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate PPG Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate NCH Corp for LSP Products Group Inc. (Barnes, Stephanie) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened image on 3/15/2019) (ajb). (Entered: 03/14/2019)

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D- Infringement Claim Chart

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C- Oatey Quadtro

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B- Oatey Quadtro

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A- 923 Patent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Oatey Co filed by LSP Products Group Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9849081) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 923 Patent, #2 Exhibit B: Oatey Quadtro, #3 Exhibit C: Oatey Quadtro, #4 Exhibit D: Infringement Claim Chart, #5 Cover Sheet) (Barnes, Stephanie) (Attachment 5 replaced with flattened image on 3/15/2019) (ajb). (Entered: 03/14/2019)

188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #128 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (mjr) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re: #127 Order by LSP Products Group Inc. (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) Letter from the Court to Counsel Regarding Settlement; dismissal papers due 3/29/2021. (Signed by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 2/3/2021) (twd) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Stay filed by LSP Products Group Inc (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) Appendix in Support filed by LSP Products Group Inc re #124 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s), #6 Additional Page(s)) (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 01/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by LSP Products Group Inc re #122 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,983,923 and Infringement of Claims 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, and 10 of U.S. Patent No. 5,983,923. (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 01/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) ***PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCUMENT REFILED AT #124 *** Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by LSP Products Group Inc re #122 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,983,923 and Infringement of Claims 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, and 10 of U.S. Patent No. 5,983,923 (Maurer, Eric) Modified on 1/25/2021 (ali). (Entered: 01/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,983,923 and Infringement of Claims 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, and 10 of U.S. Patent No. 5,983,923 filed by LSP Products Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #119 Appendix in Support (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/31/2020) filed by Oatey Co (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Pt 2 of appendix) (Wood, Tammy) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9880715) filed by LSP Products Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Amy, Scott) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Maurer. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/26/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9868381) filed by LSP Products Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Maurer, Eric) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Oatey Co; served on 3/18/2019. (Barnes, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Oatey Co. (ajb) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ajb) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case filed by LSP Products Group Inc. (Barnes, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LSP Products Group Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate PPG Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate NCH Corp for LSP Products Group Inc. (Barnes, Stephanie) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened image on 3/15/2019) (ajb). (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Oatey Co filed by LSP Products Group Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9849081) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 923 Patent, #2 Exhibit B: Oatey Quadtro, #3 Exhibit C: Oatey Quadtro, #4 Exhibit D: Infringement Claim Chart, #5 Cover Sheet) (Barnes, Stephanie) (Attachment 5 replaced with flattened image on 3/15/2019) (ajb). (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OATEY CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where LSP Products Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tammy Swinney Wood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey A Tinker