LPP Combustion, LLC v. General Electric Company et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15558979), filed by LPP Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LPP Combustion, LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa)(zv). (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LPP Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to General Electric Company. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to GE Gas Power International. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to GE Digital LLC. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pro Hac Vice Letter to LPP Combustion, LLC for Paul R. Hart. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Pro Hac Vice Letter to LPP Combustion, LLC for Adam P. Seitz. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for P. Hart ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15573334) by on behalf of LPP Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for A. Seitz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15574975) by on behalf of LPP Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Acknowledgment of Service returned by LPP Combustion, LLC. for General Electric Company (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Acknowledgment of Service returned by LPP Combustion, LLC. for GE Digital, LLC (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Acknowledgment of Service returned by LPP Combustion, LLC. for GE Gas Power International (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R. Hart. Attorney added for LPP Combustion, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam P. Seitz. Attorney added for LPP Combustion, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond by GE Digital LLC, GE Gas Power International, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: All Defendants.UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT from January 18, 2022 to March 04, 2022. (zv) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court GRANTS the Motion. However, Counsel is instructed to adhere to the Court's Standing Orders and file such requests as notices going forward. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TOMOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT has up to and through March 4, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. (zv) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less