This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:01:52 (UTC).

LPP Combustion, LLC v. General Electric Company et al

Case Summary

On December 22, 2021, LPP Combustion, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “LPP”), represented by Melissa R. Smith of Gillam and Smith, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against General Electric Company (“GEC”), GE Digital LLC (“GE Digital”), and GE Gas Power International (“GE Gas Power”) (collectively, “Defendant” or “GE”), seeking injunctive relief and damages along with pre- and post-judgement interests and other reliefs for the Defendants’ alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. The case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 7,770,396 (“the ‘396 Patent”); United States Patent No. 7,934,924 (“the ‘924 Patent”); and United States Patent No. 7,435,080 (“the ‘080 Patent”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant also knowingly and intentionally induces infringement of at least claims 1 and 10 of the ’396 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(b). As set forth above in paragraphs 11-13, Defendant has extensive knowledge of Plaintiff’s patent portfolio, having entered into three separate confidentiality agreements and collaborated on numerous plans to implement Plaintiff’s patented technology. Accordingly, Defendant had specific knowledge of the ‘396 Patent and knew or should have known that the Accused System infringed.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Despite this knowledge, Defendant continues to actively encourage and instruct its customers to use the Accused System in ways that directly infringe the ’396 Patent. Defendant did so knowing and intending that its customers will commit these infringing acts. Defendant also continues to make, use, offer for sale, and/or sell the Accused System, despite knowledge of the ’396 Patent, thereby specifically intending for and inducing customers to infringe the ’396 Patent through the customers’ normal and customary use of the Accused System.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant has also infringed, and continues to infringe, at least Claims 1 and 10 of the ’396 Patent by selling or offering for sale the Accused System, knowing that the Accused System constitutes a material part of the inventions claimed in the ’396 Patent, is especially made or adapted to infringe the ’396 Patent, and is not a staple article or commodity of commerce suitable for non-infringing use. Defendant has been, and currently is, contributorily infringing the ’396 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. §§ 271(c) and (f). By making, using, offering for sale, and/or selling the Accused System, Defendant has injured Plaintiff and is liable for infringement of the ’396 Patent pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271. Plaintiff has been harmed by this infringement and is entitled to compensation in an amount no less than a reasonable royalty as well as its lost profits for Defendant’s infringement.”

 

Similar allegations have been made by the Plaintiff with reference to the alleged infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

 

There are three claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for declaratory and permanent injunctive relief along with damages, costs, expenses; pre- and post-judgment interest; an accounting and to pay supplemental damages to Plaintiff; attorneys’ fees and enhanced damages; and any other relief the Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01343

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LPP Combustion, LLC

Defendants

General Electric Company

GE Digital LLC

GE Gas Power International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam P. Seitz

Attorney at Erise IP, P.A.

7015 College Blvd., Suite 700

Overland Park, KS 66211

Paul R. Hart

Attorney at Erise IP. P.A.

5299 Dtc Blvd., Suite 1340

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Defendant Attorney

Mark N. Reiter

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201-6901

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond by GE Digital LLC, GE Gas Power International, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam P. Seitz. Attorney added for LPP Combustion, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R. Hart. Attorney added for LPP Combustion, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#14

(#14) Acknowledgment of Service returned by LPP Combustion, LLC. for GE Gas Power International (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for A. Seitz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15574975) by on behalf of LPP Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R. Hart. Attorney added for LPP Combustion, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

1 #17

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond by GE Digital LLC, GE Gas Power International, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

32 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TOMOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT has up to and through March 4, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. (zv) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court GRANTS the Motion. However, Counsel is instructed to adhere to the Court's Standing Orders and file such requests as notices going forward. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: All Defendants.UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT from January 18, 2022 to March 04, 2022. (zv) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Move, or Otherwise Respond by GE Digital LLC, GE Gas Power International, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam P. Seitz. Attorney added for LPP Combustion, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R. Hart. Attorney added for LPP Combustion, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Acknowledgment of Service returned by LPP Combustion, LLC. for GE Gas Power International (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Acknowledgment of Service returned by LPP Combustion, LLC. for GE Digital, LLC (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Acknowledgment of Service returned by LPP Combustion, LLC. for General Electric Company (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for A. Seitz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15574975) by on behalf of LPP Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pro Hac Vice Letter to LPP Combustion, LLC for Paul R. Hart. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to GE Digital LLC. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to GE Gas Power International. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to General Electric Company. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LPP Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa)(zv). (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LPP Combustion, LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15558979), filed by LPP Combustion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Electric International Operations Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Nolan Reiter