This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2019 at 07:58:40 (UTC).

LPC Property Management, LLC v. Felton et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 LPC Property Management, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Felton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02576

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LPC Property Management, LLC

Defendants

Cynthia Felton

Indian Head, MD 20640

Erick Felton

Indian Head, MD 20640

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wilton O Nedd, II

Attorney at Mallios Rider and Goley LLP

4200 Parliament Place, Suite 100

Lanham, MD 20706

Ava N Brown

Attorney at Mallios Rider and Goley LLP

4200 Parliament Place, Suite 100

Lanham, MD 20706

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LPC Property Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mid-Atlantic Military Family Communities, LLC, Other Affiliate United States of America, Department of the Navy, Other Affiliate Lincoln Family Communities, LLC, Other Affiliate LMH Manager, Inc., Other Affiliate Lincoln Mid-Atlantic Asset Management LLC for LPC Property Management, LLC.(Brown, Ava) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Cynthia Felton, Erick Felton.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER the Clerk take all necessary steps to issue summons and return summons to plaintiff. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/30/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

1 #7

Attachment

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Summons Erick Felton

1 #4

Summons Cynthia Felton

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice

1 #2

Exhibit B - Ledger

1 #1

Exhibit A - Lease

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8249407.), filed by LPC Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Ledger, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Summons Cynthia Felton, #5 Summons Erick Felton, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Attachment)(Brown, Ava) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LPC Property Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mid-Atlantic Military Family Communities, LLC, Other Affiliate United States of America, Department of the Navy, Other Affiliate Lincoln Family Communities, LLC, Other Affiliate LMH Manager, Inc., Other Affiliate Lincoln Mid-Atlantic Asset Management LLC for LPC Property Management, LLC.(Brown, Ava) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Cynthia Felton, Erick Felton.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER the Clerk take all necessary steps to issue summons and return summons to plaintiff. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/30/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8249407.), filed by LPC Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Ledger, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Summons Cynthia Felton, #5 Summons Erick Felton, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Attachment)(Brown, Ava) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less