This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2020 at 11:01:30 (UTC).

Lozada-Florez et al v. Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Lozada-Florez filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlos E. Mendoza and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01511

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sharon Lozada-Florez

Khalil Lamdak

Defendants

Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations

U.S. Attorney General

Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida

Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services

District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Florida

Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shahzad Ahmed

Attorney at Brink Ahmed Immigration

5401 S. Kirkman Rd., Suite. 105

Orlando, FL 32819

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/24/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure and Initial Disclosure by Khalil Lamdak, Sharon Lozada-Florez (Ahmed, Shahzad) Modified on 8/31/2020 (ARJ). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Khalil Lamdak, Sharon Lozada-Florez. Related case(s): No (Ahmed, Shahzad) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/24/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/24/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS issued as to Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Florida, Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (EJS) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Florida, Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida, U.S. Attorney General; Filing Fee $400, Receipt Number ORL09773 filed by Khalil Lamdak, Sharon Lozada-Florez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (I0485 USCIS Address Update Confirmation), #2 Exhibit 2 (I-130 USCIS Online Case Status), #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJS) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTOR FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Field Office Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant