Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:51:36 (UTC).

Lowry et al v. Iniguez

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Lowry filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Iniguez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Lowry

Defendant

Julia Iniguez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John H. Nix

Attorney at Law Office of John H Nix, PC

514 N Elm Street

Sherman, TX 75090

W. Cullen McMahon

Attorney at W. Cullen McMahon, PLLC

12221 Merit Dr, Ste 945

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew C. Kane

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber, PLLC

119 N Robinson Ave, Ste 900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Gerard F. Pignato

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber, PLLC

16408 Muirfield Pl

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 9/21/2020. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2020. Exhibit List due by 8/28/2020. Witness List due by 8/28/2020. Discovery due by 9/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2020. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 10/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 11/17/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Additionally, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

14 #2

Defendant's Consent Form

14 #1

Plaintiff's Consent Form

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#13

(#13) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Julia Iniguez (Kane, Matthew) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

12 #1

Consent or Reassignment Form

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 2/14/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Relief from LCvR83.3 by All Plaintiffs; Responses due by 2/4/2020(McMahon, W.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by All Plaintiffs [NOTE: Attorney W. Cullen McMahon added to party Lisa Lowry(pty:pla), Attorney W. Cullen McMahon added to party Lisa Lowry(pty:pla)]. Responses due by 2/4/2020(McMahon, W.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Julia Iniguez (Pignato, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Interested Parties (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Julia Iniguez (Pignato, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew C. Kane on behalf of Julia Iniguez (Kane, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Declarations Page

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number CJ-2019-219 by Julia Iniguez (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 9/21/2020. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2020. Exhibit List due by 8/28/2020. Witness List due by 8/28/2020. Discovery due by 9/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2020. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 10/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 11/17/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Additionally, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Julia Iniguez (Kane, Matthew) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 2/14/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder DENYING AS MOOT #9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from LCvR 83.3. Plaintiffs' counsel, W. Cullen McMahon, was previously admitted to practice in the Eastern District of Oklahoma and is therefore allowed to proceed as Plaintiffs' counsel without having to associate with local counsel. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Accordingly, attorney John H. Nix is deemed as WITHDRAWN and attorney W. Cullen McMahon is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for plaintiff(s) Lisa Lowry. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Relief from LCvR83.3 by All Plaintiffs; Responses due by 2/4/2020(McMahon, W.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by All Plaintiffs [NOTE: Attorney W. Cullen McMahon added to party Lisa Lowry(pty:pla), Attorney W. Cullen McMahon added to party Lisa Lowry(pty:pla)]. Responses due by 2/4/2020(McMahon, W.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Julia Iniguez (Pignato, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Interested Parties (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Julia Iniguez (Pignato, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew C. Kane on behalf of Julia Iniguez (Kane, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gerard F. Pignato on behalf of Julia Iniguez (Pignato, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/6/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1329488 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Julia Iniguez (Pignato, Gerard) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 1/13/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number CJ-2019-219 by Julia Iniguez (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Julia Iniguez (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Julia Iniguez by Lisa Lowry(individually and representative of the estate of Jimmy Lowry) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less