This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2022 at 08:21:57 (UTC).

Adriane Lowe v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 Adriane Lowe filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01823

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adriane Lowe

Defendants

C. R. Bard, Inc.

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ramon R Lopez

120 Vantis Drive Suite 430

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Ramon R. Lopez

Attorney at Lopez McHugh LLP

120 Vantis Drive Suite 430

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Amorina Patrice Lopez

Attorney at Lopez McHugh LLP

120 Vantis Drive Suite 430

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#7

(#7) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adriane Lowe, (Lopez, Ramon) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Supplement Summons

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Supplement Summons

#12

(#12) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01945 MWF(PJWx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01823 MWF(MAAx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (ap) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Adriane Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons)(Lopez, Ramon) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Adriane Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons)(Lopez, Ramon) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adriane Lowe, (Lopez, Ramon) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32974969 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Adriane Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Ramon R Lopez added to party Adriane Lowe(pty:pla))(Lopez, Ramon) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amorina Patrice Lopez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramon R Lopez