This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2021 at 08:09:53 (UTC).

LOWE v. ARCONIC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 LOWE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ARCONIC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00632

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD LOWE

Defendant

arconic

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARK R. NATALE

Attorney at MALAMUT & ASSOCIATES

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 500

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

MARK NATALE

Attorney at Malamut & Associates, LLC

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 500

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Defendant Attorneys

Molly E. Meacham

Attorney at Babst, Calland, Clements and Zomnir, P.C.

Two Gateway Center, Sixth Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Brian D. Lipkin

Attorney at Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir, P.C.

Two Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) REPLY BRIEF re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by ARCONIC. (Meacham, Molly) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#17

(#17) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/8/2021. (dmm) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#16

(#16) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTIONS PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/8/2021. (dmm) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05988. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS GRANTED IN PART. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRCIT OF PA. THE CLERK OF COURT SHLAL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/7/21.6/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit Ex. A

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer (revised opposition to motion to dismiss) filed by Edward Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#6

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by Edward Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLY E. MEACHAM on behalf of ARCONIC (MEACHAM, MOLLY) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN D. LIPKIN on behalf of ARCONIC (LIPKIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARCONIC, filed by Edward Lowe.(NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/3/2020. 12/9/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Case Management Track

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ARCONIC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14742858.), filed by Edward Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: an Oral Argument was held on 8/4/2021. (Court Reporter: Sharon Siatkowski) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER, the Video Oral Argument set for 7/15/2021 is canceled and rescheduled to 8/4/2021 at 9:00 AM in Video Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Chambers staff will send Counsel information on accessing the video link prior to the Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/29/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER, an Oral Argument is set for 7/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in a Video Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan regarding Arconic's #6 Motion to Dismiss. Chambers staff will send counsel information about accessing the video feed prior to the Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/28/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY BRIEF re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by ARCONIC. (Meacham, Molly) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/8/2021. (dmm) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTIONS PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/8/2021. (dmm) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05988. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS GRANTED IN PART. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRCIT OF PA. THE CLERK OF COURT SHLAL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/7/21.6/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer (revised opposition to motion to dismiss) filed by Edward Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by Edward Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Danielle Stevens, Guaranteed Subpoena re: served Summons, Complaint upon Robin Hutt-Banks, intake specialist by Personal service on 4/19/2021 (NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by ARCONIC. (MEACHAM, MOLLY) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by ARCONIC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MEACHAM, MOLLY) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MOLLY E. MEACHAM on behalf of ARCONIC (MEACHAM, MOLLY) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN D. LIPKIN on behalf of ARCONIC (LIPKIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARCONIC, filed by Edward Lowe.(NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/3/2020. 12/9/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ARCONIC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/30/2020 (bw, ) Modified on 1/11/2021 (lvj, ). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Edward Lowe. (md, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ARCONIC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14742858.), filed by Edward Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(NATALE, MARK) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arconic Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molly E. Meacham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian D. Lipkin