This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:04:42 (UTC).

LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD v. INDYNE INC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INDYNE INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS and MARK E WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00587

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD

LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD doing business as LVW ELECTRONICS INC

Defendant

INDYNE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL ELDEN NORDBY

Attorney at SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP - TALLAHASSEE FL

215 S Monroe St - Ste 804

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint with Exhibits 1 & 2 served on Intake Specialist / Legal Representative authorized to accept service on behalf of Indyne, Inc. c/o R/A CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company on 1/13/2020, filed by LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD. (NORDBY, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to INDYNE INC. (blb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Summons to be Issued by Clerk by LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD (NORDBY, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (NORDBY, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Indyne, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4730622.), filed by Low Voltage Wiring, Ltd. d/b/a LVW Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (NORDBY, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines for INDYNE INC answer due 2/3/2020. (blb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint with Exhibits 1 & 2 served on Intake Specialist / Legal Representative authorized to accept service on behalf of Indyne, Inc. c/o R/A CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company on 1/13/2020, filed by LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD. (NORDBY, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to INDYNE INC. (blb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Summons to be Issued by Clerk by LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD (NORDBY, DANIEL) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (NORDBY, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney NORDBY Re #1 Complaint filed by LOW VOLTAGE WIRING LTD- Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents'. PLEASE FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", regarding the use of Upper/Lowercase Letters (both available on the clerk's website). (blb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Indyne, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4730622.), filed by Low Voltage Wiring, Ltd. d/b/a LVW Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (NORDBY, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less