This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2023 at 09:18:33 (UTC).

Loving v. Gusar, LLC

Case Summary

On February 23, 2023, Samantha Loving (“Loving” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Cesar Tavares of Williams Hart Boundas Easterby, LLP, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Amazon.com, Inc. and Gusar, LLC DBA Colsen Fire Pits (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking declaratory relief and damages for alleged severe burns suffered by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas.

In the complaint, plaintiff alleged, “On June 26, 2022, Plaintiff owned and used a Colsen tabletop rubbing alcohol fireplace indoor outdoor fire pit portable fire concrete bowl pot fireplace (Colsen fire pit) purchased on Amazon.com and sold by Gusar, LLC. The Colsen fire pit was purchased through Amazon’s website, Amazon.com, on April 24, 2022.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “The Colsen fire pit was designed, manufactured, and introduced into the stream of commerce by the defendants Gusar, LLC. And Amazon, who were engaged in the business of designing, manufacturing, licensing, testing, advertising, marketing, warranting, selling, and distributing various types of electronics, including the type of fire pit which injured Plaintiff. The Defendants sold these products, including the Gusar, LLC. Fire pit, via Amazon’s online marketplace and distribution system.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Amazon heavily portrayed itself as a safe and trustworthy company. Plaintiff believed Amazon would not have allowed dangerous products like the Colsen fire pit to be available for sale on its website. Further, Plaintiff believed that if Amazon learned the Colsen fire pit was dangerous, Amazon would conduct a prompt and thorough investigation of that product and, when appropriate, notify purchasers of that product and/or completely remove the product from its e-commerce platform.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “On or about July 1, 2021, and February 7, 2022, reviewers posted on Amazon’s website the reviews of the Colsen tabletop fire pit. Amazon was therefore on notice of the unreasonably dangerous nature of the Colsen fire pit before it was purchased by Plaintiff and before Plaintiff was injured by it. The unsafe condition including any latent defects that made the Colsen fire pit prone to dangerous overheating, flame jetting, and ignited fuel spilling over was one that a basic investigation by Amazon would have easily and quickly revealed.”

Additionally, the plaintiff alleged, “Despite this, Amazon did nothing to mitigate this danger. Amazon did not properly vet Defendant Gusar, LLC. Before listing their products on Amazon’s website, properly vet the Colsen fire pit before listing it on Amazon’s website, recall, remove, or bar the Colsen fire pit from Amazon’s website, or warn or otherwise notify Plaintiff about the unreasonably dangerous condition of the Colsen fire pit.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “These acts and omissions of Defendants resulted in Plaintiff purchasing the Colsen fire pit. On June 26, 2022, Plaintiff lit the Colsen fire pit in accordance with the instructions. Immediately after the Colsen fire pit was lit and without warning, a fireball erupted startling Plaintiff causing the Colsen fire pit to tip over leak out the ignited alcohol. Plaintiff suffered severe burns to over forty percent of her body. Plaintiff suffered severe burns requiring emergency medical treatment, surgical intervention, and ongoing medical care.”

Plaintiff presented four claims for relief, including alleged strict products liability, breach of express warrant, and negligence.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory relief along with an award of damages worth $75,000.00 for bodily injury, disfigurement, conscious pain, suffering, mental anguish, mental suffering, embarrassment, shame, and loss of enjoyment of life. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of unicourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a unicourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samantha Loving

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc.

Gusar, LLC doing business as Colsen Fire Pits

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alma J. Reyes

Michael Arturo Samaniego

Cesar Tavares

Defendant Attorneys

Teia Moore Kelly

Frank David Lanter

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc., Gusar, LLC DBA Colsen Firepits (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29511249) filed by Samantha Loving.(Tavares, Cesar) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/14/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazon.com, Inc., Gusar, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment Summons Request)(Tavares, Cesar) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

3 #1

Unredacted attachment Summons Request

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc., Gusar, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

4 #1

Summons - Amazon.com,Inc.

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Amazon.com, Inc. served on 3/3/2023, answer due 3/24/2023, filed.(TerriHanniable, 4) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Samantha Loving, filed.(Tavares, Cesar) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gusar, LLC, filed.(Lanter, Frank) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc., filed.(Kelly, Teia) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amazon.com, Inc., filed.(Kelly, Teia) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com, Inc., filed.(Kelly, Teia) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com, Inc., filed.(Kelly, Teia) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amazon.com, Inc., filed.(Kelly, Teia) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc., filed.(Kelly, Teia) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gusar, LLC, filed.(Lanter, Frank) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Samantha Loving, filed.(Tavares, Cesar) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Amazon.com, Inc. served on 3/3/2023, answer due 3/24/2023, filed.(TerriHanniable, 4) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc., Gusar, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amazon.com, Inc., Gusar, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment Summons Request)(Tavares, Cesar) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/14/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc., Gusar, LLC DBA Colsen Firepits (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29511249) filed by Samantha Loving.(Tavares, Cesar) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less