This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 08:04:01 (UTC).

Lovers Lane v. Torrid, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Lovers Lane filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Torrid, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Denise Page Hood and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10033

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise Page Hood

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lovers Lane

Counter Claimant, Counter Defendant and Defendant

Torrid, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David S. McDaniel

Attorney at Jaffe, Raitt,Heuer & Weiss, P.C.

27777 Franklin Road, Suite 2500

Southfield, MI 48034

Counter Claimant, Counter Defendant and Defendant Attorney

Jon M. Bylsma

Attorney at Varnum, Riddering,

P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Torrid, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Los Angeles. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (McDaniel, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 1/13/2022 (SSch) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Torrid, LLC* (BHan) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark REPORT by Lovers Lane (McDaniel, David) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Torrid, LLC served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. (McDaniel, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Bylsma on behalf of Torrid, LLC. (Bylsma, Jon) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Torrid, LLC against Torrid, LLC by Torrid, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12/1/21 Letter, #2 Exhibit USPTO's Trademark Status) (Bylsma, Jon) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit 12/1/21 Letter

7 #2

Exhibit USPTO's Trademark Status

#8

(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Torrid, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TORRID HOLDINGS, INC. for Torrid, LLC, Torrid, LLC. (Bylsma, Jon) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2022 10:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Lovers Lane. (McDaniel, David) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Lovers Lane. (McDaniel, David) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2022 10:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Torrid, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TORRID HOLDINGS, INC. for Torrid, LLC, Torrid, LLC. (Bylsma, Jon) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Torrid, LLC against Torrid, LLC by Torrid, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12/1/21 Letter, #2 Exhibit USPTO's Trademark Status) (Bylsma, Jon) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Bylsma on behalf of Torrid, LLC. (Bylsma, Jon) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Torrid, LLC served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. (McDaniel, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark REPORT by Lovers Lane (McDaniel, David) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Torrid, LLC* (BHan) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFILING FEE Received in the amount of 402.00 by Lovers Lane - Receipt No. DET139008 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 1/13/2022 (SSch) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Torrid, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Los Angeles. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (McDaniel, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Torrid LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon M. Bylsma