This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 09:54:11 (UTC).

Lovell v. Salazar

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Lovell filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Salazar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Jelderks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01218

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Jelderks

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Don Douglas Lovell

Sheridan, OR 97378

Respondent

Josias Salazar

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order, #3 sent to Don Douglas Lovell returned as undeliverable. (sss) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Petitioner has neither submitted the filing fee nor moved to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, should Petitioner wish to continue with this case, he must submit a filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this Order. Should Petitioner fail to do so, I will recommend that the case be dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 8/10/2020 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/10/2020.) (joha) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/27/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#1

(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). Filed by Don Douglas Lovell against Josias Salazar. (dsg) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order, #3 sent to Don Douglas Lovell returned as undeliverable. (sss) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Petitioner has neither submitted the filing fee nor moved to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, should Petitioner wish to continue with this case, he must submit a filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this Order. Should Petitioner fail to do so, I will recommend that the case be dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 8/10/2020 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/10/2020.) (joha) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/27/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). Filed by Don Douglas Lovell against Josias Salazar. (dsg) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less