This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 06:00:34 (UTC).

Lovelady et al v. Syngenta AG et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Lovelady filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Syngenta AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-PQ-00704

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vickie Lovelady

Forrest Lovelady

Defendants

Chevron USA, Inc.

Syngenta AG

Syngenta Crop Protection LLC

Special Master

Randi Ellis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Khaldoun A. Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup, Melodia, Kelly & Schoenberger

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Meyers & Flowers, LLC

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 1515

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Shoemake Doles

Attorney at Carey Danis & Lowe - St. Louis

8235 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Shreedhar R. Patel

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier Bartlett PC

1201 Elm St., Ste. 3400

Dallas, TX 75270

Defendant Attorneys

Jihan E. Walker

Attorney at Jones Day - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Megan Ann Scheiderer

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - Kansas City

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

Bradley H. Weidenhammer

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Leslie M. Smith

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael J. Nester

Attorney at Donovan Rose Nester, P.C.

15 North First Street, Suite A

Belleville, IL 62220

Ragan Naresh

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Washington DC

1301 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Rebecca C. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Service to Defendants

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Chevron USA, Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC ; originals mailed to Attorney Patel. (mar) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Chevron USA, Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4511661.), filed by Forrest Lovelady, Vickie Lovelady. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Patel, Shreedhar) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Forrest Lovelady, Vickie Lovelady. Chevron USA, Inc. served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; Syngenta Crop Protection LLC served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service to Defendants)(Patel, Shreedhar) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Chevron USA, Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC ; originals mailed to Attorney Patel. (mar) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-pq-704-NJR. (mar) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Chevron USA, Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4511661.), filed by Forrest Lovelady, Vickie Lovelady. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Patel, Shreedhar) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Syngenta Crop Protection L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Syngenta, AG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shreedhar R. Patel