This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2019 at 07:44:28 (UTC).

Love v. NC Department of Public Safety et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Love filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against NC Department of Public Safety. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank D. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeremy R. Love

Taylorsville, NC 28681

Jeremy R. Love El

Taylorsville, NC 28681

Defendants

NC Department of Public Safety

FNU Dye

FNU Carver

FNU Chester

FNU Beaver

FNU Ramsey

FNU Dula

Kenneth E. Lassiter

Betty Brown

Swindell Edwards

FNU Turner

Chris Ritch

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Envelope

#9

8 #1

Envelope

#8

7 #1

Envelope

#7

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

#3

1 #6

Exhibit B2 - Administrative Remedy Procedure

1 #5

Exhibit A1 - Inmate Request Form

1 #4

Exhibit C - Branch Temple Information

1 #3

Exhibit B - Questionnaire and Additional Laws

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeremy Love

1 #1

Exhibit A - Moorish Science Temple

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Proposed Summons by Jeremy R. Love (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jeremy R. Love. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nvc) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Jeremy R. Love (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nvc) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Jeremy R. Love. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 06/21/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (nvc) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Instructions to Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 6/10/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Jeremy R. Love (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FNU Beaver, Betty Brown, FNU Carver, FNU Chester, FNU Dula, FNU Dye, Swindell Edwards, Kenneth E. Lassiter, NC Department of Public Safety, FNU Ramsey, Chris Ritch, FNU Turner, filed by Jeremy R. Love. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Moorish Science Temple, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeremy Love, #3 Exhibit B - Questionnaire and Additional Laws, #4 Exhibit C - Branch Temple Information, #5 Exhibit A1 - Inmate Request Form, #6 Exhibit B2 - Administrative Remedy Procedure, #7 Exhibit C2 - Letter from Chaplain Ramsey, #8 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Khalig Hasan, #9 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Reginald Privette, #10 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Monchreo Shonwaun, #11 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Talib Ali Muhammad, #12 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Latwang Janell Reid, #13 Exhibit A - Moorish Divine and National Movement of the World, #14 Exhibit B - Disciplinary Report Reid, #15 Exhibit C3 - Modified Housing Case Mgt, #16 Proposed Order to Show Cause for PI and Tro and Memorandum, #17 Envelope) (tmg) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where N.C. Dept. of Public Safety is a litigant