This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 10:29:56 (UTC).

Love v. First Watch Restaurants Incorporated

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 Love filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raner C Collins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00413

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raner C Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasmine Love

Defendant

First Watch Restaurants Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lori Marie Griffin

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm LLC

Heritage Bldg., 34555 Chagrin Blvd., Ste. 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Anthony James Lazzaro

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm LLC

Heritage Bldg., 34555 Chagrin Blvd., Ste. 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Matthew S Grimsley

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm LLC

Heritage Bldg., 34555 Chagrin Blvd., Ste. 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Alanna Klein Fischer

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm LLC

Heritage Bldg., 34555 Chagrin Blvd., Ste. 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Don J Foty

Attorney at Hodges & Foty LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd., Ste. 200

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

John Alan Doran

Attorney at Sherman & Howard LLC - Scottsdale, AZ

7033 E Greenway Pkwy., Ste. 250

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jasmine Love. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING parties' Joint #12 Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Second Request). This case shall be stayed until 3/10/22. Defendant First Watch Restaurants Incorporated shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Jasmine Love's Collective and Class Action Complaint no later than 3/17/22. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 2/1/22. (BAC) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Second Request) by First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doran, John) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING Joint #10 Motion to Stay Stay Deadline. This case shall be stayed for 60 days until 2/8/22. Defendant First Watch Restaurants, Incorporated shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Jasmine Love's Collective and Class Action Complaint no later than 2/8/22. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 12/13/21. (BAC) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay Joint Motion for 60 Day yStay of Proceedings by First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doran, John) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. First Watch shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Jasmine Love's Collective and Class Action Complaint no later than 12/19/21. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 11/19/21. (BAC) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline (First Request) by First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doran, John) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#7

(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jasmine Love: Proof of Service . (Grimsley, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Reissued as to First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Jasmine Love. (Grimsley, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Jasmine Love. (Grimsley, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#2

1 #2

Exhibit

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal having been filed, Doc. #14 , this case is hereby terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jasmine Love. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING parties' Joint #12 Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Second Request). This case shall be stayed until 3/10/22. Defendant First Watch Restaurants Incorporated shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Jasmine Love's Collective and Class Action Complaint no later than 3/17/22. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 2/1/22. (BAC) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Second Request) by First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doran, John) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING Joint #10 Motion to Stay Stay Deadline. This case shall be stayed for 60 days until 2/8/22. Defendant First Watch Restaurants, Incorporated shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Jasmine Love's Collective and Class Action Complaint no later than 2/8/22. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 12/13/21. (BAC) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Stay Joint Motion for 60 Day yStay of Proceedings by First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doran, John) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. First Watch shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Jasmine Love's Collective and Class Action Complaint no later than 12/19/21. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 11/19/21. (BAC) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Responsive Pleading Deadline (First Request) by First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doran, John) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jasmine Love: Proof of Service . (Grimsley, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Reissued as to First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Don J Foty, Anthony James Lazzaro, Lori Marie Griffin, Alanna Klein Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Jasmine Love. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Jasmine Love. (Grimsley, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to First Watch Restaurants Incorporated. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Jasmine Love. (Grimsley, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew S Grimsley on behalf of Plaintiff Jasmine Love. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19953649. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-413-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19953649 filed by Jasmine Love. (Foty, Don) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Watch Restaurants, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Alan Doran