This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2021 at 09:21:27 (UTC).

Love v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Love filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert H. Cleland, Anthony P. Patti and Stephanie Dawkins Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-12228

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judges

Robert H. Cleland

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenyada Love

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union LLC

HireRight, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tarek N. Chami

Attorney at Chami Law

22000 Michigan Ave., Ste. 200

Dearborn, MI 48124

David A. Chami

Attorney at Price Law Group, APC

8245 North 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Defendant Attorneys

Eric A. Nicholson

Attorney at Jones Day - Detroit

150 W. Jefferson Ave., Suite 2100

Detroit, MI 48226

Brian A. Nettleingham

Attorney at Maddin, Hauser,

28400 Northwestern Highway, Third Floor

Southfield, MI 48034

Kari Annette Morrigan

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P. C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Jessica G. Kingston

Attorney at Littler Mendelson. P.C.

200 Renaissance Center, Suite 3110

Detroit, MI 48243

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by HireRight, LLC (Kingston, Jessica) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by HireRight, LLC. (Kingston, Jessica) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#19

(#19) STIPULATED ORDER To Further Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline. Defendant HireRight, LLC's answer due: 11/18/21. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Trans Union LLC to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Answer due by 11/29/21. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by HireRight, LLC (Kingston, Jessica) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica G. Kingston on behalf of HireRight, LLC. (Kingston, Jessica) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#15

(#15) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Nicholson, Eric) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Nicholson, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION (Joint) For Extension Of Time For Trans Union, LLC To Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Trans Union LLC (Morrigan, Kari) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. HireRight, LLC served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Chami, Tarek) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/25/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Chami, Tarek) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#7

(#7) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Morrigan, Kari) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kari Annette Morrigan on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Morrigan, Kari) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian A. Nettleingham appearing on behalf of Trans Union LLC as Local Counsel (Nettleingham, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trans Union LLC served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Chami, Tarek) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#2

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by HireRight, LLC (Kingston, Jessica) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by HireRight, LLC. (Kingston, Jessica) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATED ORDER To Further Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline. Defendant HireRight, LLC's answer due: 11/18/21. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Trans Union LLC to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Answer due by 11/29/21. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by HireRight, LLC (Kingston, Jessica) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica G. Kingston on behalf of HireRight, LLC. (Kingston, Jessica) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Nicholson, Eric) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Nicholson, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION (Joint) For Extension Of Time For Trans Union, LLC To Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Trans Union LLC (Morrigan, Kari) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Nicholson on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Nicholson, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. HireRight, LLC served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Chami, Tarek) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/25/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Chami, Tarek) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Morrigan, Kari) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kari Annette Morrigan on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Morrigan, Kari) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian A. Nettleingham appearing on behalf of Trans Union LLC as Local Counsel (Nettleingham, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trans Union LLC served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Chami, Tarek) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Tarek N. Chami on behalf of Kenyada Love. (Chami, Tarek) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kenyada Love against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., HireRight, LLC, Trans Union LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8624137 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Chami, David) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HireRight, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant