This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2020 at 07:14:40 (UTC).

Love v. Checkr, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2019 Love filed an Other lawsuit against Checkr, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07730

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antwan Love

Defendant

Checkr, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erika Angelos Heath

Attorney at Duckworth & Peters LLP

369 Pine Street, Suite 410

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Checkr, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 11/24/2019) (Entered: 11/24/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of Fair Credit Reporting Act; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendant Checkr, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13921266). Filed by Antwan Love. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 11/24/2019) Modified on 11/26/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/24/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Antwan Love. Service waived by Checkr, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 12/3/2019) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Antwan Love.. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 12/10/2019) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Antwan Love.. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 12/10/2019) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Antwan Love. Service waived by Checkr, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 12/3/2019) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Checkr, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/9/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 11/24/2019) (Entered: 11/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of Fair Credit Reporting Act; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendant Checkr, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13921266). Filed by Antwan Love. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Heath, Erika) (Filed on 11/24/2019) Modified on 11/26/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.