This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 08:07:45 (UTC).

Love County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma LP et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Love County Board of County Commissioners filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald A. White and Gregory K. Frizzell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Ronald A. White

Gregory K. Frizzell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Love County Board of County Commissioners

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Purdue Pharma LP

Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Morris & Dickson Co., LLC

Allergan, PLC

Purdue Frederick Company, The

Perry Fine

Insys Therapeutic, Inc.

Actavis PLC

Anda, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Keysource Medical, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew J. Sill

Attorney at Fulmer Sill Law Group

Po Box 2448

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Todd A. Court

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Defendant Attorneys

Don W. Danz

Attorney at Holden Litigation (Tulsa)

15 E 5Th St, Ste 3900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Jon Epstein

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (OKC)

100 N Broadway, Ste 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8865

Ray E. Zschiesche

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Ste 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Evan Way

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (OKC)

324 N Robinson Ave, Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8273

Joshua D. Burns

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (OKC)

324 N Robinson Ave, Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8273

Jeffrey A. Curran

Attorney at GableGotwals - OKC

211 N Robinson, 15Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Ashley E. Quinn

Attorney at GableGotwals - OKC

211 N Robinson, 15Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Robert A. Bragalone

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP (OKC)

101 Park Ave, Ste 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joe M. Hampton

Attorney at Hampton Barghols Pierce, PLLC

210 W Park Ave, Ste 2700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Robert G. McCampbell

Attorney at GableGotwals - OKC

211 N Robinson, 15Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Ryan A. Ray

Attorney at Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler Jeter Barnett & Ray

401 S Boston, Ste 2900

Tulsa, OK 74103

D. Todd Riddles

Attorney at Cheek Law Firm, PLLC

311 N Harvey Ave, Ste 200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Other Attorneys

Kaylee Davis-Maddy

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson (OKC)

210 Park Ave, Ste 1200

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

D. Michael McBride, III

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (TUL)

321 S Boston, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74103-3313

Susan E. Huntsman

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (TUL)

321 S Boston, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74103-3313

Stuart D. Campbell

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson (Tulsa)

Two W Second St, Ste 700

Tulsa, OK 74103-3117

John H. Sparks

Attorney at Odom Sparks & Jones, PLLC

2500 Mcgee Dr, Ste 140

Norman, OK 73072

G. Calvin Sharpe

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Ste 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

43 #2

Exhibit MDL Order

43 #1

Exhibit Statement of Interest

#43

(#43) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #31 MOTION to Remand ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

42 #1

Exhibit MDL Order

32 #1

Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma

#32

(#39) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell directing Defendants to file their expedited Responses by 11/6/2019 to #32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand. No Replies shall be filed. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

31 #2

Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth

31 #1

Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith

#31

(#40) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #31 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

2 #41

Exhibit 41 - Summons - Walgreens

2 #40

Exhibit 40 - Summons - Oklahoma CVS

2 #39

Exhibit 39 - Summons - CVS

2 #38

Exhibit 38 - Summons - CVS

2 #37

Exhibit 37 - Summons - PTC

2 #36

Exhibit 36 - Summons - PTC

2 #35

Exhibit 35 - Summons - PTC

2 #30

Exhibit 30- Summons - GCP

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #31 MOTION to Remand ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #32 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #32 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #31 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell directing Defendants to file their expedited Responses by 11/6/2019 to #32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand. No Replies shall be filed. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell granting #36 Defendants Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER by Judge Gregory K. Frizzell granting #33 Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 11/12/2019(Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Curran on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/23/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1302598 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. ( Filing Fee due by 9/30/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Love County District Court, case number CJ-2019-008 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #32 Exhibit 32 - Summons - Morris, #33 Exhibit 33 - Summons - Quest, #34 Exhibit 34 - Summons - Harvard, #35 Exhibit 35 - Summons - PTC, #36 Exhibit 36 - Summons - PTC, #37 Exhibit 37 - Summons - PTC, #38 Exhibit 38 - Summons - CVS, #39 Exhibit 39 - Summons - CVS, #40 Exhibit 40 - Summons - Oklahoma CVS, #41 Exhibit 41 - Summons - Walgreens, #42 Exhibit 42 - Summons - Walgreens, #43 Exhibit 43 - Summons - Fine, #44 Exhibit 44 - Summons - Webster, #45 Exhibit 45 - EOA - Quest, #46 Exhibit 46 - Motion - Quest, #47 Exhibit 47 - EOA - McKesson, #48 Exhibit 48 - Motion - McKesson, #49 Exhibit 49 - EOA - Harvard Drug, #50 Exhibit 50 - EOA - Cardinal, #51 Exhibit 51 - EOA - Amerisource, #52 Exhibit 52 - EOA - Anda, #53 Exhibit 53 - Motion - Anda, #54 Exhibit 54 - Motion - CVS, #55 Exhibit 55 - Order - CVS, #56 Exhibit 56 - Order - Anda, #57 Exhibit 57 - Motion - Manufacturer Defendants, #58 Exhibit 58 - Order - McKesson, #59 Exhibit 59 - Order - Defendants Motion, #60 Exhibit 60 - Order - Manufacturer, #61 Exhibit 61 - EOA - Purdue, #62 Exhibit 62 - Notice of Bankruptcy, #63 Exhibit 63 - Docket Sheet) (jcb, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, GCP Pharma, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Lynn Webster by Love County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Morris & Dickson Co., LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant