This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2022 at 07:14:36 (UTC).

Louisiana et al v.Centers for Disease Control & Prevention et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2022 Louisiana filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Centers for Disease Control Prevention. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert R Summerhays and Carol B Whitehurst. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00885

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Louisiana

State of Arizona

State of Missouri

Defendants

Centers for Disease Control & Prevention

Rochelle Walensky

U S Dept of Health & Human Services

Xavier Becerra

U S Dept of Homeland Security

Alejandro Mayorkas

U S Customs & Border Protection

Christopher Magnus

U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement

Tae Johnson

U S Citizenship & Immigration Services

Ur Jaddou

U S Border Patrol

Raul Ortiz

U S Dept of Justice

Merrick Garland

Executive Off of Immigration

201 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Baker Murrill

Joseph Scott St John

Drew C Ensign

D John Sauer

Michael Talent

Defendant Attorneys

John Robinson

Erez R Reuveni

Jean Lin

Jonathan D Kossak

Joseph John DeMott

Other Attorneys

Thomas Tyler Hydrick

Stephen John Petrany

John S Campbell, III

Autumn Hamit Patterson

Robert Henneke

Mary Catherine Yanik

Esther H Sung

Gabriela Cruz

Karen C Tumlin

Jacob Kennedy Weixler

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#106

(#106) APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Innovation Law Lab for Hearing held on May 13, 2022 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter LaRae Bourque (aty,Vogel, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

105 #2

Proposed order

105 #1

Certificate of good standing

#105

(#105) MOTION for Thomas A. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125171) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

104 #2

Proposed order

104 #1

Certificate of good standing

#104

(#104) MOTION for Edmund G. LaCour to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125143) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

103 #2

Proposed order

103 #1

Certificate of good standing

3 #2

Proposed order

3 #1

Certificate of good standing

#3

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of D John Sauer for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/8/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Rochelle Walensky, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas, U S Customs & Border Protection, Christopher Magnus, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou, U S Border Patrol, Raul Ortiz, U S Dept of Justice, Merrick Garland, Executive Off of Immigration, David Neal, Joseph R Biden, Jr, USA. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

1 #4

Civil cover sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5054315) filed by State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Arizona(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Missouri(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

213 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Innovation Law Lab for Hearing held on May 13, 2022 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter LaRae Bourque (aty,Vogel, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) MOTION for Thomas A. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125171) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) MOTION for Edmund G. LaCour to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125143) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) MOTION for Christopher Robison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125010) by State of Alaska. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) MOTION for Cori Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124900) by State of Alaska. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) MOTION for Bryan Cleveland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124688) by State of Oklahoma. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) MOTION for Andrew N. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124553) by Commonwealth of Virginia. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) MOTION for Lucas W.E. Croslow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124456) by Commonwealth of Virginia. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) ORDER that the Expedited Motion to Stay Nationwide Scope of Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal #97 filed by Alicia De Los Angles Duran Raymundo, Kevin Alexi De Leon and Innovation Law Lab is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/27/2022. (crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding MOTION to Expedite #97 and MOTION to Stay re #90 Memorandum Ruling, #91 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite Pending Appeal filed by Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D Kossak on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney John Robinson added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Robinson, John) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney Jean Lin added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Lin, Jean) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael Talent for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/8/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of D John Sauer for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/8/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Michael Talent to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5061335) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for D. John Sauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5061325) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Rochelle Walensky, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas, U S Customs & Border Protection, Christopher Magnus, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou, U S Border Patrol, Raul Ortiz, U S Dept of Justice, Merrick Garland, Executive Off of Immigration, David Neal, Joseph R Biden, Jr, USA. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5054315) filed by State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Arizona(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Missouri(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less