This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2022 at 07:14:36 (UTC).

Louisiana et al v.Centers for Disease Control & Prevention et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2022 Louisiana filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Centers for Disease Control Prevention. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, LouisianaWestern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert R Summerhays and Carol B Whitehurst. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00885

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Louisiana

State of Arizona

State of Missouri

Defendants

Centers for Disease Control & Prevention

Rochelle Walensky

U S Dept of Health & Human Services

Xavier Becerra

U S Dept of Homeland Security

Alejandro Mayorkas

U S Customs & Border Protection

Christopher Magnus

U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement

Tae Johnson

U S Citizenship & Immigration Services

Ur Jaddou

U S Border Patrol

Raul Ortiz

U S Dept of Justice

Merrick Garland

Executive Off of Immigration

201 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Baker Murrill

Attorney at LA Atty Generals Office (94005)

P O Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

Joseph Scott St John

Attorney at LA Dept of Justice (1850)

909 Poydras St Ste 1850

New Orleans, LA 70112

Drew C Ensign

Attorney at Attorney General of AZ

2005 N Central Ave

Phoenix, AZ 85004

D John Sauer

Attorney at Attorney General of MO

207 W High St

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Michael Talent

Attorney at Attorney General of MO

207 W High St

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Defendant Attorneys

John Robinson

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice (L St)

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Erez R Reuveni

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice Civil Div (5th)

450 5Th St N W

Washington, DC 20001

Jean Lin

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice (L St)

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jonathan D Kossak

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice (L St)

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Joseph John DeMott

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice (L St/11508)

1100 L St N W Ste 11508

Washington, DC 20005

Other Attorneys

Thomas Tyler Hydrick

Attorney at Attorney General of SC

P O Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211-1549

Stephen John Petrany

Attorney at Attorney General of GA

40 Capitol Square S W

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

John S Campbell, III

Attorney at Taylor Porter et al (BR)

P O Box 2471

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Autumn Hamit Patterson

Attorney at Texas Public Policy Foundation

901 Congress Ave

Austin, TX 78701

Robert Henneke

Attorney at Texas Public Policy Foundation

901 Congress Ave

Austin, TX 78701

Mary Catherine Yanik

Attorney at Tulane Law Clinic

6329 Freret St

New Orleans, LA 70118

Esther H Sung

Attorney at Justice Action Center

P O Box 27280

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Gabriela Cruz

Attorney at Tulane Law Clinic

6329 Freret St

New Orleans, LA 70118

Karen C Tumlin

Attorney at Law Office of Karen C Tumlin

P O Box 27280

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Jacob Kennedy Weixler

Attorney at Weixler Law L L C

P O Box 52197

New Orleans, LA 70152-2197

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#106

(#106) APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Innovation Law Lab for Hearing held on May 13, 2022 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter LaRae Bourque (aty,Vogel, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

105 #2

Proposed order

105 #1

Certificate of good standing

#105

(#105) MOTION for Thomas A. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125171) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

104 #2

Proposed order

104 #1

Certificate of good standing

#104

(#104) MOTION for Edmund G. LaCour to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125143) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

103 #2

Proposed order

103 #1

Certificate of good standing

3 #2

Proposed order

3 #1

Certificate of good standing

#3

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of D John Sauer for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/8/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Rochelle Walensky, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas, U S Customs & Border Protection, Christopher Magnus, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou, U S Border Patrol, Raul Ortiz, U S Dept of Justice, Merrick Garland, Executive Off of Immigration, David Neal, Joseph R Biden, Jr, USA. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

1 #4

Civil cover sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5054315) filed by State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Arizona(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Missouri(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

213 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Innovation Law Lab for Hearing held on May 13, 2022 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter LaRae Bourque (aty,Vogel, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) MOTION for Thomas A. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125171) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) MOTION for Edmund G. LaCour to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125143) by State of Alabama. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) MOTION for Christopher Robison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5125010) by State of Alaska. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) MOTION for Cori Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124900) by State of Alaska. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) MOTION for Bryan Cleveland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124688) by State of Oklahoma. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) MOTION for Andrew N. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124553) by Commonwealth of Virginia. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) MOTION for Lucas W.E. Croslow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5124456) by Commonwealth of Virginia. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) ORDER that the Expedited Motion to Stay Nationwide Scope of Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal #97 filed by Alicia De Los Angles Duran Raymundo, Kevin Alexi De Leon and Innovation Law Lab is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 5/27/2022. (crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding MOTION to Expedite #97 and MOTION to Stay re #90 Memorandum Ruling, #91 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Expedite Pending Appeal filed by Innovation Law Lab. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,WalkerSld, B) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D Kossak on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan D Kossak added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney John Robinson added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney John Robinson added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Robinson, John) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Joseph R Biden, Jr, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, U S Customs & Border Protection, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Merrick Garland, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Executive Off of Immigration, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Ur Jaddou, Tae Johnson, U S Dept of Justice, Christopher Magnus, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Neal, Raul Ortiz, U S Border Patrol, USA, Rochelle Walensky (Attorney Jean Lin added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Joseph R Biden, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Citizenship & Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Customs & Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Centers for Disease Control & Prevention(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Health & Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Executive Off of Immigration(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Ur Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Tae Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Dept of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Christopher Magnus(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party David Neal(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Raul Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party U S Border Patrol(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party USA(pty:dft), Attorney Jean Lin added to party Rochelle Walensky(pty:dft)) (aty,Lin, Jean) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael Talent for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/8/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of D John Sauer for State of Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/8/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Michael Talent to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5061335) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for D. John Sauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5061325) by State of Missouri. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Rochelle Walensky, U S Dept of Health & Human Services, Xavier Becerra, U S Dept of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas, U S Customs & Border Protection, Christopher Magnus, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Tae Johnson, U S Citizenship & Immigration Services, Ur Jaddou, U S Border Patrol, Raul Ortiz, U S Dept of Justice, Merrick Garland, Executive Off of Immigration, David Neal, Joseph R Biden, Jr, USA. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5054315) filed by State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Arizona(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Louisiana(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Baker Murrill added to party State of Missouri(pty:pla))(aty,Murrill, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Border Patrol is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Customs and Border Protection is a litigant