This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2021 at 08:10:29 (UTC).

Louis Vuitton Malletier v. cheaplouisvuittonoutlet.com et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Louis Vuitton Malletier filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against cheaplouisvuittonoutlet com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Lurana S. Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-62101

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER

Defendants

louisvuittons.us

louixvuiton.com

louisvuittonbagsstore.com

maonewbags.com

bomulnara.biz

china-group.moscow

fabagg.co

realwatch.pro

cheaplouisvuittonoutlet.com

fakelvstore.com

handbags-louisvuittonoutlet.com

louisvuittonbagsonsale.com

louisvuitton-ru.com

louis-vuittons.shop

lvoutletsnew.top

nikeajok.com

lvbagging.com

lvbagstores.com

lv-fashionbags.com

255 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez

Attorney at Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-453

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Virgilio Gigante

Attorney at Stephen M Gaffigan PA

401 E Las Olas Boulevard, #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Stephen Michael Gaffigan

Attorney at Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Blvd., #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Other Attorneys

Ricco Carlos Washburn

Attorney at Louis Law Group, PLLC

7951 Riviera Boulevard, Suite 103

Miramar, FL 33023

 

Court Documents

28 #2

Text of Proposed Order

28 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk'

28 #28

Main Document

26 #3

Affidavit of Service

26 #2

Affidavit of Service

26 #1

Affidavit of Service

26 #26

Main Document

23 #1

Certificate of Service

23 #23

Main Document

3 #1

Complaint

3 #3

Main Document

1 #6

Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Website captures (Part 4)

1 #5

Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Website captures (Part 3)

1 #4

Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Website captures (Part 2)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Website captures (Part 1)

1 #2

Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Louis Vuitton

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Clerks Entry of Default as to 1mmtt.su, Whitic.com, aaaqualitygoods.ru, aaasupplier.com, aalux.ru, alimordesinger.com, alipatrendz.com, allforlux3.shop, allright1.com, awamoda-parfums.com, bagsbyvip.com, bagscnshop.top, bagsrightdesigner.com, baobags2021.top, barbce.xyz, batluxury.com, bestify.ru, biosro.xyz, bmlin.shop, bomulnara.biz, borsaoutlet.net, borsedisconto.com, brand-shop.one, brands-msk.ru, brdshowplaza.ru, brmx.ru, cheaplouisvuittonoutlet.com, china-group.moscow, cloverry.com, cnhandbagstore.top, copy432.ru, copy666.com, copy98k.ru, copynn123.ru, dailyshow.store, datsbrandstore.in, diaozhaji.com, dolabuy.su, essenceofluxury105.ru, every-designer.ru, fabagg.co, fakehandbagsale.com, fakelvstore.com, fashionbagoutlet.online, fashionbeast.ru, fashionluxurious.com, fauxpursesale.com, finnerr.com, flexshop1.com, globestyle.ru, goluxuryshop.com, handbags-louisvuittonoutlet.com, hot-handbag.com, impurse.com, jewelryhold.com, kasperschoenen.nl, lbagsos.com, lebrouges.in, liabags.com, lionshopp.com, lordkicks.net, louis-soa.shop, louis-vuittons.shop, louisvuitton-ru.com, louisvuittonbagsonsale.com, louisvuittonbagsstore.com, louisvuittons.us, louixvuiton.com, lussoeborseit.com, luxeborses.com, luxesavers.com, luxtrendy.co.kr, luxtrendy.kr, luxury-bag-sale.ru, luxury-baron.com, luxury-sa.store, luxurysu.com, luxurytasticreplicas.ru, luxuryvip55.ru, lv-fashionbags.com, lvbagging.com, lvbagstores.com, lvshoppe.com, maonewbags.com, newnicesales.com, niuuo.com, oldcobbler.net, palm-mall.com, perfectfakehandbag.com, perfectimitationshop.com, picknavy1.com, picknavyt.com, picknewbags.com, pickyourbags.com, pistol.pe.kr, pursesvalleyfactory.ru, pursevalleyshop.ru, reacase.com, readheadlinenews.com, realwatch.pro, reaoccur.com, replgogo.com, replicaclubs.ru, replicalvstore.com, replicapa.com, replicaxe.com, sarannosalseri.it, sdrkj.net, shop345.ru, shopinwera.shop, shunfengru.ru, smq4.com, sneakerstrade.net, sophiebagshop.com, sophielouise.shop, specopys.com, stevensupermall.cn, sumkavip.com, supersumki.com, suriaklcc.vip, sutekicase.com, tatler-moda.ru, thebrandworld.org, tokei7777.com, top1984.com, topk88.ru, toplvshop.com, topshop66a.com, trendseeker.fashion, trendystore24.ru, ulhgs.com, unahub.ru, unixx24.ru, vikkia.com, vipbrands.app, vsnc333.ru, watchlu.com, wearsurly.net, wenwenluxury.com, wgkjw.com, wikitopshop.com, worth-shop.net, wsdhpkli.com, xn--ph1b7hs38aize8lawv.com, yizifei1.com, yourcopyoriginal.it - Motions Terminated: #28 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,,,,,,,,, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 12/3/2021. (amb) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 1mmtt.su, Whitic.com, aaaqualitygoods.ru, aaasupplier.com, aalux.ru, alimordesinger.com, alipatrendz.com, allforlux3.shop, allright1.com, awamoda-parfums.com, bagsbyvip.com, bagscnshop.top, bagsrightdesigner.com, baobags2021.top, barbce.xyz, batluxury.com, bestify.ru, biosro.xyz, bmlin.shop, bomulnara.biz, borsaoutlet.net, borsedisconto.com, brand-shop.one, brands-msk.ru, brdshowplaza.ru, brmx.ru, cheaplouisvuittonoutlet.com, china-group.moscow, cnhandbagstore.top, copy432.ru, copy666.com, copy98k.ru, copynn123.ru, dailyshow.store, datsbrandstore.in, diaozhaji.com, dolabuy.su, essenceofluxury105.ru, every-designer.ru, fabagg.co, fakehandbagsale.com, fakelvstore.com, fashionbagoutlet.online, fashionbeast.ru, fashionluxurious.com, fauxpursesale.com, finnerr.com, flexshop1.com, globestyle.ru, goluxuryshop.com, handbags-louisvuittonoutlet.com, hot-handbag.com, impurse.com, jewelryhold.com, kasperschoenen.nl, lbagsos.com, lebrouges.in, liabags.com, lionshopp.com, lordkicks.net, louis-soa.shop, louis-vuittons.shop, louisvuitton-ru.com, louisvuittonbagsonsale.com, louisvuittonbagsstore.com, louisvuittons.us, louixvuiton.com, lussoeborseit.com, luxeborses.com, luxesavers.com, luxtrendy.co.kr, luxtrendy.kr, luxury-bag-sale.ru, luxury-baron.com, luxury-sa.store, luxurysu.com, luxurytasticreplicas.ru, luxuryvip55.ru, lv-fashionbags.com, lvbagging.com, lvbagstores.com, lvshoppe.com, maonewbags.com, newnicesales.com, niuuo.com, oldcobbler.net, palm-mall.com, perfectfakehandbag.com, perfectimitationshop.com, picknavy1.com, picknavyt.com, picknewbags.com, pickyourbags.com, pistol.pe.kr, pursesvalleyfactory.ru, pursevalleyshop.ru, reacase.com, readheadlinenews.com, realwatch.pro, reaoccur.com, replgogo.com, replicaclubs.ru, replicalvstore.com, replicapa.com, replicaxe.com, sarannosalseri.it, sdrkj.net, shop345.ru, shopinwera.shop, shunfengru.ru, smq4.com, sneakerstrade.net, sophiebagshop.com, sophielouise.shop, specopys.com, stevensupermall.cn, sumkavip.com, supersumki.com, suriaklcc.vip, sutekicase.com, tatler-moda.ru, thebrandworld.org, tokei7777.com, top1984.com, topk88.ru, toplvshop.com, topshop66a.com, trendseeker.fashion, trendystore24.ru, ulhgs.com, unahub.ru, unixx24.ru, vikkia.com, vipbrands.app, vsnc333.ru, watchlu.com, wearsurly.net, wenwenluxury.com, wgkjw.com, wikitopshop.com, worth-shop.net, wsdhpkli.com, xn--ph1b7hs38aize8lawv.com, yizifei1.com, yourcopyoriginal.it by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies without prejudice #23 Defendant cloverry.com's motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The motion lacks a certificate of conferral as required by Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). After meaningful conferral with the opposite side, the Defendant may refile the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER. 1mmtt.su served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; Whitic.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; aaaqualitygoods.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; aaasupplier.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; aalux.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; alimordesinger.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; alipatrendz.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; allforlux3.shop served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; allright1.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; awamoda-parfums.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; bagsbyvip.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; bagscnshop.top served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; bagsrightdesigner.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; baobags2021.top served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; barbce.xyz served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; batluxury.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; bestify.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; biosro.xyz served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; bmlin.shop served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; bomulnara.biz served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; borsaoutlet.net served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; borsedisconto.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; brand-shop.one served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; brands-msk.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; brdshowplaza.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; brmx.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; cheaplouisvuittonoutlet.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; china-group.moscow served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; cloverry.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; cnhandbagstore.top served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; copy432.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; copy666.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; copy98k.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; copynn123.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; dailyshow.store served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; datsbrandstore.in served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; diaozhaji.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; dolabuy.su served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; essenceofluxury105.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; every-designer.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; fabagg.co served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; fakehandbagsale.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; fakelvstore.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; fashionbagoutlet.online served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; fashionbeast.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; fashionluxurious.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; fauxpursesale.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; finnerr.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; flexshop1.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; globestyle.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; goluxuryshop.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; handbags-louisvuittonoutlet.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; hot-handbag.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; impurse.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; jewelryhold.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; kasperschoenen.nl served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lbagsos.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lebrouges.in served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; liabags.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lionshopp.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lordkicks.net served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; louis-soa.shop served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; louis-vuittons.shop served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; louisvuitton-ru.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; louisvuittonbagsonsale.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; louisvuittonbagsstore.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; louisvuittons.us served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; louixvuiton.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lussoeborseit.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxeborses.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxesavers.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxtrendy.co.kr served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxtrendy.kr served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxury-bag-sale.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxury-baron.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxury-sa.store served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxurysu.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxurytasticreplicas.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; luxuryvip55.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lv-fashionbags.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lvbagging.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lvbagstores.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; lvshoppe.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; maonewbags.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; newnicesales.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; niuuo.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; oldcobbler.net served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; palm-mall.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; perfectfakehandbag.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; perfectimitationshop.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; picknavy1.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; picknavyt.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; picknewbags.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; pickyourbags.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; pistol.pe.kr served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; pursesvalleyfactory.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; pursevalleyshop.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; reacase.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; readheadlinenews.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; realwatch.pro served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; reaoccur.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; replgogo.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; replicaclubs.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; replicalvstore.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; replicapa.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; replicaxe.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; sarannosalseri.it served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; sdrkj.net served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; shop345.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; shopinwera.shop served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; shunfengru.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; smq4.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; sneakerstrade.net served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; sophiebagshop.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; sophielouise.shop served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; specopys.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; stevensupermall.cn served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; sumkavip.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; supersumki.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; suriaklcc.vip served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; sutekicase.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; tatler-moda.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; thebrandworld.org served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; tokei7777.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; top1984.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; topk88.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; toplvshop.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; topshop66a.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; trendseeker.fashion served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; trendystore24.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; ulhgs.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; unahub.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; unixx24.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; vikkia.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; vipbrands.app served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; vsnc333.ru served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; watchlu.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; wearsurly.net served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; wenwenluxury.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; wgkjw.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; wikitopshop.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; worth-shop.net served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; wsdhpkli.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; xn--ph1b7hs38aize8lawv.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; yizifei1.com served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021; yourcopyoriginal.it served on 11/9/2021, response/answer due 11/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER re #18 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER re #18 Order on Ex Parte Motion,, #16 Order upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice) (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by cloverry.com. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Washburn, Ricco) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricco Carlos Washburn on behalf of cloverry.com. Attorney Ricco Carlos Washburn added to party cloverry.com(pty:dft). (Washburn, Ricco) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Summons Issued as to 1mmtt.su, Whitic.com, aaaqualitygoods.ru, aaasupplier.com, aalux.ru, alimordesinger.com, alipatrendz.com, allforlux3.shop, allright1.com, awamoda-parfums.com, bagsbyvip.com, bagscnshop.top, bagsrightdesigner.com, baobags2021.top, barbce.xyz, batluxury.com, bestify.ru, biosro.xyz, bmlin.shop, bomulnara.biz, borsaoutlet.net, borsedisconto.com, brand-shop.one, brands-msk.ru, brdshowplaza.ru, brmx.ru, cheaplouisvuittonoutlet.com, china-group.moscow, cloverry.com, cnhandbagstore.top, copy432.ru, copy666.com, copy98k.ru, copynn123.ru, dailyshow.store, datsbrandstore.in, diaozhaji.com, dolabuy.su, essenceofluxury105.ru, every-designer.ru, fabagg.co, fakehandbagsale.com, fakelvstore.com, fashionbagoutlet.online, fashionbeast.ru, fashionluxurious.com, fauxpursesale.com, finnerr.com, flexshop1.com, globestyle.ru, goluxuryshop.com, handbags-louisvuittonoutlet.com, hot-handbag.com, impurse.com, jewelryhold.com, kasperschoenen.nl, lbagsos.com, lebrouges.in, liabags.com, lionshopp.com, lordkicks.net, louis-soa.shop, louis-vuittons.shop, louisvuitton-ru.com, louisvuittonbagsonsale.com, louisvuittonbagsstore.com, louisvuittons.us, louixvuiton.com, lussoeborseit.com, luxeborses.com, luxesavers.com, luxtrendy.co.kr, luxtrendy.kr, luxury-bag-sale.ru, luxury-baron.com, luxury-sa.store, luxurysu.com, luxurytasticreplicas.ru, luxuryvip55.ru, lv-fashionbags.com, lvbagging.com, lvbagstores.com, lvshoppe.com, maonewbags.com, newnicesales.com, niuuo.com, oldcobbler.net, palm-mall.com, perfectfakehandbag.com, perfectimitationshop.com, picknavy1.com, picknavyt.com, picknewbags.com, pickyourbags.com, pistol.pe.kr, pursesvalleyfactory.ru, pursevalleyshop.ru, reacase.com, readheadlinenews.com, realwatch.pro, reaoccur.com, replgogo.com, replicaclubs.ru, replicalvstore.com, replicapa.com, replicaxe.com, sarannosalseri.it, sdrkj.net, shop345.ru, shopinwera.shop, shunfengru.ru, smq4.com, sneakerstrade.net, sophiebagshop.com, sophielouise.shop, specopys.com, stevensupermall.cn, sumkavip.com, supersumki.com, suriaklcc.vip, sutekicase.com, tatler-moda.ru, thebrandworld.org, tokei7777.com, top1984.com, topk88.ru, toplvshop.com, topshop66a.com, trendseeker.fashion, trendystore24.ru, ulhgs.com, unahub.ru, unixx24.ru, vikkia.com, vipbrands.app, vsnc333.ru, watchlu.com, wearsurly.net, wenwenluxury.com, wgkjw.com, wikitopshop.com, worth-shop.net, wsdhpkli.com, xn--ph1b7hs38aize8lawv.com, yizifei1.com, yourcopyoriginal.it. (amb) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Amended by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER re #9 Order on Ex Parte Motion, (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER re #9 Order on Ex Parte Motion, (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #6 Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (nc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #5 Ex Parte Motion Entry of Temporary Restraining Order. Any response or opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction must be filed and served on the Plaintiff's counsel by 10/28/2021, and filed with the Court, along with Proof of Service. A hearing is set before this Court on 11/1/2021 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (nc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Motion) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #18 Order on 11/3/2021 (nc). (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Hadrien Huet in Support of Plaintiffs Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Declaration of Hadrien Huet in Support of Plaintiffs Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #18 Order on 11/3/2021 (nc). (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton SE for LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (pes) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15078763, filed by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Louis Vuitton Trademarks, #3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Website captures (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Website captures (Part 2), #5 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Website captures (Part 3), #6 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Website captures (Part 4))(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less