This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2021 at 09:41:16 (UTC).

Louis Vuitton Malletier S.A.S. v. Sandra Ling Designs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Louis Vuitton Malletier S A S filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Sandra Ling Designs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00352

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S.

Defendants

SANDRA LING DESIGNS, INC.

Sandra Ling

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Carlile Rawls, III

Attorney at Baker Williams Matthiesen LLP

5005 Woodway Drive, Suite 201

Houston, TX 77056

Thomas M Williams

Attorney at Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg LLP

200 West Madison St., Ste. 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Silbert

Attorney at Baker Williams Mattheisen LLP

3950 Laurel Canyon Blvd. No. 40052

Studio City, CA 77002

Robert Eliot Shapiro

Attorney at Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbarm & Nagelberg LLP

200 West Madison St.,, Ste. 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Karen Bryant Tripp

Attorney at Attorney at Law

Po Box 1301

Houston, TX 77251-1301

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition to #24 MOTION for More Definite Statement, filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier S.A.S.. (Rawls, John) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sandra Ling, Sandra Ling Designs, Inc., filed.(Tripp, Karen) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

24 #1

Proposed Order Granting motion for more definite statement under Rule 12(e)

#24

(#24) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Sandra Ling, Sandra Ling Designs, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting motion for more definite statement under Rule 12(e))(Tripp, Karen) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer Complaint by Sandra Ling, Sandra Ling Designs, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tripp, Karen) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#21

(#21) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Louis Vuitton Malletier S.A.S. identifying LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton S.A. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#15

(#20) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Sarah Silbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit A to Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

6 #1

Exhibit A to Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#6

(#17) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Robert Eliot Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#5

(#5) Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sandra Ling, SANDRA LING DESIGNS, INC., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#2

(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#5) Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition to #24 MOTION for More Definite Statement, filed by Louis Vuitton Malletier S.A.S.. (Rawls, John) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sandra Ling, Sandra Ling Designs, Inc., filed.(Tripp, Karen) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Sandra Ling, Sandra Ling Designs, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting motion for more definite statement under Rule 12(e))(Tripp, Karen) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer Complaint by Sandra Ling, Sandra Ling Designs, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tripp, Karen) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Louis Vuitton Malletier S.A.S. identifying LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton S.A. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Sarah Silbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sandra Ling served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021, filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sandra Ling Designs, Inc. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021, filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Robert Eliot Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Sandra Ling, Sandra Ling Designs, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DESIGNATION of Robert E. Shapiro as attorney in charge of LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Sarah Silbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Thomas M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Robert E. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sandra Ling, SANDRA LING DESIGNS, INC., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S., filed.(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sandra Ling, SANDRA LING DESIGNS, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25908286) filed by LOUIS VUITTON MALLETIER S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rawls, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Eliot Shapiro(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas M. Williams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Carlile Rawls, III