This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2019 at 07:49:37 (UTC).

Lough v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Lough filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Kleeh and James P. Mazzone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

Referral Judge

James P. Mazzone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beverly Lough

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy F. Cogan

Attorney at Cassidy, Cogan, Shapell & Voegelin, L.C.

First State Capitol Building, 1413 Eoff Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. The Court ORDERS and NOTICES that in accordance with LR Gen P 3.01, Plaintiff shall stipulate in an affidavit that any recovery in the action shall, pursuant to the order of the Court, bepaid to the Clerk, who shall pay therefrom any remaining unpaid costs taxed against the Plaintiff and remit the balance to the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 7/26/2019. (Copy to USM.)(wrr) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 US Attorney, #2 US Attorney General)(jss) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. The Court ORDERS and NOTICES that in accordance with LR Gen P 3.01, Plaintiff shall stipulate in an affidavit that any recovery in the action shall, pursuant to the order of the Court, bepaid to the Clerk, who shall pay therefrom any remaining unpaid costs taxed against the Plaintiff and remit the balance to the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 7/26/2019. (Copy to USM.)(wrr) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Non-redacted #1 Complaint filed by Beverly Lough. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jss) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Beverly Lough. (jss) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Beverly Lough. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Decision - Unfavorable, #3 Exhibit B - Order of Appeals Council, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss) Modified on 7/19/2019 - Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2862581 (jss). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy F. Cogan