This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2019 at 09:33:13 (UTC).

Louden v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 Louden filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Smith and William Matthewman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-81067

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

Referral Judge

William Matthewman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Louden

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil Vijay Singh

Attorney at Law Offices of Neil V. Singh PA

10100 West Sample Road Third Floor

Coral Springs, FL 33065

Andres H. Lopez

Attorney at The Andres Lopez Law Firm

101 Ne Third Avenue, Suite 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Jon Dale Derrevere

Attorney at Derrevere Stevens Black & Cozad

2005 Vista Parkway, Suite 210

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant to Rule 26 by Robert Louden (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#16

(#16) Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by Target Corporation (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#14

(#14) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Robert Louden (Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediator Selection Deadline 11/21/2019. Mediation Deadline 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 8/25/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2019., Expert Discovery due by 3/13/2020., Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/9/2019., Mediation Deadline 12/31/2019., In Limine Motions due by 7/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2020., Motions due by 7/17/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/31/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable William Matthewman, United States Magistrate Judge, for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/21/2019)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order

#11

(#11) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Target Corporation re #5 MOTION to Preserve Evidence , #6 MOTION to Preserve Evidence Exhibits Agreed Order as to Plaintiff's Motion [DE 5] and [DE 6] (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres H. Lopez on behalf of Robert Louden. Attorney Andres H. Lopez added to party Robert Louden(pty:pla). (Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Preserve Evidence , #6 MOTION to Preserve Evidence Exhibits filed by Target Corporation. Replies due by 8/21/2019. (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Preserve Evidence Exhibits by Robert Louden. (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Preserve Evidence by Robert Louden. (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Neil Vijay Singh (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Target's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plt's Complain

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons & Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant to Rule 26 by Robert Louden (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Initial Disclosure(s) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by Target Corporation (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (kza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Robert Louden (Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediator Selection Deadline 11/21/2019. Mediation Deadline 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 8/25/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2019., Expert Discovery due by 3/13/2020., Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/9/2019., Mediation Deadline 12/31/2019., In Limine Motions due by 7/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2020., Motions due by 7/17/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/31/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable William Matthewman, United States Magistrate Judge, for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Target Corporation re #5 MOTION to Preserve Evidence , #6 MOTION to Preserve Evidence Exhibits Agreed Order as to Plaintiff's Motion [DE 5] and [DE 6] (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres H. Lopez on behalf of Robert Louden. Attorney Andres H. Lopez added to party Robert Louden(pty:pla). (Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Preserve Evidence , #6 MOTION to Preserve Evidence Exhibits filed by Target Corporation. Replies due by 8/21/2019. (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Preserve Evidence Exhibits by Robert Louden. (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Preserve Evidence by Robert Louden. (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Neil Vijay Singh (Singh, Neil) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11850327, filed by Target Corporation. Defendant's Answer and affirmative defenses filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Target's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plt's Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Louden's Counsel April 10, 2019 Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Counsel's July 22, 2019 Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Jon D. Derrevere, Esquire, #7 Exhibit 7 - Copies of all Process, Pleadings and other Papers filed in State Court, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Derrevere, Jon)Text Modified on 7/29/2019 (mee). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Singh(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andres H Lopez