This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 07:47:09 (UTC).

Lott v. SC Johnson and Son Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Lott filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against SC Johnson and Son Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00956

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Annamarie Lott

Defendants

SC Johnson and Son Inc

Oars + Alps LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Ryan Gustafson

Attorney at Good Gustafson Aumais LLP

2330 Westwood Blvd., Ste. 103

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Oars + Alps LLC, SC Johnson and Son Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Ryan Gustafson* *2330 Westwood Blvd* *Ste. 103* *Los Angeles, CA 90064*. (Coll, A) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Consent Form

3 #2

VDRP

#4

(#4) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to SC Johnson and Son Inc on 6/14/2022. (Gustafson, John) Modified on 6/22/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Oars + Alps LLC on 6/14/2022. (Gustafson, John) Modified on 6/22/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Oars + Alps LLC on 6/14/2022. (Gustafson, John) Modified on 6/22/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to SC Johnson and Son Inc on 6/14/2022. (Gustafson, John) Modified on 6/22/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Oars + Alps LLC, SC Johnson and Son Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Ryan Gustafson* *2330 Westwood Blvd* *Ste. 103* *Los Angeles, CA 90064*. (Coll, A) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Annamarie Lott. Attorney Gustafson, John Ryan added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10259383) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gustafson, John) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less