This case was last updated from PACER on 08/08/2021 at 09:18:32 (UTC).

Lorrie Sue McClary v. Supreme Court of California et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Lorrie Sue McClary filed an Other lawsuit against Supreme Court of California. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Steve Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00980

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lorrie Sue McClary

Coulterville, CA 95311

Defendants

San Bernardino Superior Court

Supreme Court of California

San Bernardino County Juvenile Division

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)or (c) filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Sue McClary. (et) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

4 #1

Voluntary Dismissal Form

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Sue McClary. (jtil) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Sue McClary against Defendants San Bernardino County Juvenile Division, San Bernardino Superior Court and Supreme Court of California. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)or (c) filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Sue McClary. (et) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim.For these reasons, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before August 2, 2021 why her in forma pauperis application should not be denied and her complaint dismissed for the reasons above. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Voluntary Dismissal Form) (clee) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Sue McClary. (jtil) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Lorrie Sue McClary against Defendants San Bernardino County Juvenile Division, San Bernardino Superior Court and Supreme Court of California. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant