This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 11:44:07 (UTC).

LORKOWSKI v. ERB INDUSTRIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 LORKOWSKI filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ERB INDUSTRIES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03255

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Lorkowski

Defendant

ERB Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald E. Weldy

Attorney at WELDY LAW

8383 Craig Street, Suite 330

Indianapolis, IN 46250

Defendant Attorney

Emily L. Connor

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2021 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/28/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ERB INDUSTRIES, INC. (Connor, Emily) Modified on 1/28/2021 (CKM). (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERB INDUSTRIES, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Delta Plus Corp., Corporate Parent Delta Plus Group for ERB INDUSTRIES, INC... (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant ERB INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ERB INDUSTRIES, INC.. (AKH) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E. Weldy on behalf of Plaintiff Paul Lorkowski. (Weldy, Ronald) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against ERB Industries, Inc., filed by Paul Lorkowski. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6334724) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Weldy, Ronald) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily L. Connor