This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2020 at 08:19:04 (UTC).

Loring et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Loring filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05370

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Estate of Charles Loring

Susan Loring

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lynne M. Kizis

Attorney at Wilentz, Goldman and Spitzer, PA

90 Woodbridge Center Drive, Suite 900, P.O. Box 10

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

Defendant Attorneys

Joe G. Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Eric G. Lasker

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-07722. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-223) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of California. (dm ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon & Complaint served on Monsanto Company on 7/8/2020, filed by SUSAN LORING, THE ESTATE OF CHARLES LORING. (KIZIS, LYNNE) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-50,, MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10986400) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SUSAN LORING, CHARLES LORING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KIZIS, LYNNE) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of New Jersey, 3:20-cv-07722-AET-TJB, Loring et al v. Monsanto Company et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-05370-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 223 cc: JPMDL (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCases associated: Create association to 3:16-md-02741-VC. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-07722. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-223) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of California. (dm ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon & Complaint served on Monsanto Company on 7/8/2020, filed by SUSAN LORING, THE ESTATE OF CHARLES LORING. (KIZIS, LYNNE) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MONSANTO COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketJudge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-50,, MONSANTO COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10986400) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SUSAN LORING, CHARLES LORING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KIZIS, LYNNE) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less