This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 11:48:42 (UTC).

Lorimar Music A Corp. et al v. Jaw Industries LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 Lorimar Music A Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Jaw Industries LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02840

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lorimar Music A Corp.

Smacktown Music

Heavy Metal Disco

Songs of Black River

Almo Music Corp.

Song Matters, Inc.

Tri-Angels Music

Reysong Inc. doing business as Rehits Music, Inc.

Defendants

Jaw Industries LLC

Andrew Hernandez

Jared Davis

Wesley Houston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Elizabeth Martinez

Stacy R Obenhaus

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of Disclosure by Almo Music Corp., Heavy Metal Disco, Lorimar Music A Corp., Reysong Inc. d/b/a Rehits Music, Inc., Smacktown Music, Song Matters, Inc., Songs of Black River, Tri-Angels Music, filed.(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/12/2022 at 11:10 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#6

(#6) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. Complaint and AO-121 mailed. (AkeitaMichael, 4) Modified on 8/24/2022 (AkeitaMichael, 4). (Entered: 08/23/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Sam S. Sheldon re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time Service Date and Case Management Plan Deadline, filed. (rhawkins) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time Service Date and Case Management Plan Deadline. Initial Conference reset for 12/8/2022 at 11:10 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lorimar Music A Corp., filed.(Martinez, Megan) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Andrew Hernandez served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022, filed.(Martinez, Megan) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jaw Industries LLC served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022, filed.(Martinez, Megan) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lorimar Music A Corp., filed.(Martinez, Megan) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTINUATION OF ENTRY #9 FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time Service Date and Case Management Plan Deadline. Initial Conference reset for 12/8/2022 at 11:10 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Sam S. Sheldon re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time Service Date and Case Management Plan Deadline, filed. (rhawkins) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time Service Date and Case Management Plan Deadline by Almo Music Corp., Heavy Metal Disco, Lorimar Music A Corp., Reysong Inc., Smacktown Music, Song Matters, Inc., Songs of Black River, Tri-Angels Music, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, Megan) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. Complaint and AO-121 mailed. (AkeitaMichael, 4) Modified on 8/24/2022 (AkeitaMichael, 4). (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/12/2022 at 11:10 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28659694) filed by Almo Music Corp., Heavy Metal Disco, Song Matters, Inc., Smacktown Music, Tri-Angels Music, Lorimar Music A Corp., Songs of Black River, Reysong Inc. d/b/a Rehits Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of Disclosure by Almo Music Corp., Heavy Metal Disco, Lorimar Music A Corp., Reysong Inc. d/b/a Rehits Music, Inc., Smacktown Music, Song Matters, Inc., Songs of Black River, Tri-Angels Music, filed.(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less