This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 05:55:25 (UTC).

Lorie Bar v. Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 Lorie Bar filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02348

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lorie Bar

Defendant

Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Anton Sirchio

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

John David Mereness

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness PC

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

Taylor Robert Seibel

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness PC

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Defendant Owners Insurance Company's ANSWER to #8 Complaint and Jury Demand by Owners Insurance Company.(Mereness, John) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#12

(#12) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 September 2022. Consent Form due by 9/27/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/27/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John David Mereness on behalf of Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney John David Mereness added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Mereness, John) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Taylor Robert Seibel on behalf of Owners Insurance Company (Seibel, Taylor) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Lorie BarAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Lorie Bar(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Owners Insurance Company on 8/22/2022. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#8

(#8) State Court COMPLAINT against Owners Insurance Company, filed by Lorie Bar.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

6 #8

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service on OIC

6 #7

Exhibit A - District Court Pre-Trial Order

6 #6

Exhibit A - District Court Webex Procedures

6 #5

Exhibit A - District Court Delay Reduction Order

6 #4

Exhibit A - District Court Summons

6 #3

Exhibit A - District Court Coversheet

6 #2

Exhibit A - District Court Complaint

6 #1

Exhibit A - Index of State Court Pleadings

6 #6

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court documents

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant Owners Insurance Company's ANSWER to #8 Complaint and Jury Demand by Owners Insurance Company.(Mereness, John) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 September 2022. Consent Form due by 9/27/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/27/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John David Mereness on behalf of Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney John David Mereness added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Mereness, John) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Taylor Robert Seibel on behalf of Owners Insurance Company (Seibel, Taylor) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Lorie BarAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Lorie Bar(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Owners Insurance Company on 8/22/2022. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) State Court COMPLAINT against Owners Insurance Company, filed by Lorie Bar.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit A - District Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit A - District Court Coversheet, #4 Exhibit A - District Court Summons, #5 Exhibit A - District Court Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit A - District Court Webex Procedures, #7 Exhibit A - District Court Pre-Trial Order, #8 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service on OIC)(Seibel, Taylor) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (tgall, ) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (tgall, ) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, ) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documentsshall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, ) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 22-cv-32316. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8652785), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court documents)(Seibel, Taylor) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John David Mereness