This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2021 at 01:50:46 (UTC).

Loridas v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Loridas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11914

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Panagiota Loridas

Defendant

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven R. Long

Attorney at The Law Office of Steven R. Long

230 Monsignor O'Brien Highway

Cambridge, MA 02141

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher G. Betke

Attorney at Coughlin & Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Mario D. Nimock

Attorney at Coughlin Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Panagiota Loridas.(Long, Steven) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#15

(#15) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/5/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2021. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit A., State Court Record

#13

(#13) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., State Court Record)(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#11

(#11) Joint CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #6 MOTION to Remand and for attorneys fees by Steven R. Long on behalf of Panagiota Loridas. (Long, Steven) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

8 #3

Exhibit C., Burwell case

8 #2

Exhibit B., Diogene case

8 #1

Exhibit A., Ciolino case

#8

(#8) Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand and for attorneys fees and costs filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., Ciolino case, #2 Exhibit B., Diogene case, #3 Exhibit C., Burwell case)(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Affidavit

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand and for attorneys fees by Panagiota Loridas.(Long, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2020: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/19/2020) (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. Teleconference # 888-808-6929 access code: 8523158. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Betke on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Panagiota Loridas.(Long, Steven) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/5/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2021. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/5/2021 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. Teleconference #: (888)-808-6929 access code: 8523158. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., State Court Record)(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: In the pleadings before this court, Plaintiff asserts that, as a result of the incident at issue, she suffered a torn right rotator cuff, for which she had surgery and claims medical bills to date totaling $45,397; sustained further injuries to her right shoulder and elbow; and continues to suffer from pain and discomfort. Based on these pleadings, the court finds a reasonable probability that the amount in controversy in this case is greater than $75,000. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and for Attorneys Fees and Costs #6 is DENIED. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#12) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 12/16/2020. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. Parties to jointly report to clerk any request for ADR or Consent to Magistrate. Motion to remand denied. Parties to confer and file a Joint Statement with proposed dates. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Steven R. Long, Mario D. Nimock) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #6 MOTION to Remand and for attorneys fees by Steven R. Long on behalf of Panagiota Loridas. (Long, Steven) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand and for attorneys fees and costs filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., Ciolino case, #2 Exhibit B., Diogene case, #3 Exhibit C., Burwell case)(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 is RESET for 12/16/2020 04:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. This hearing may be conducted by telephone (Teleconference # 888-808-6929 access code: 8523158) or video conference. Counsel will be notified in advance. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand and for attorneys fees by Panagiota Loridas.(Long, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2020: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/19/2020) (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. Teleconference # 888-808-6929 access code: 8523158. (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Betke on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8478327 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1., Complaint and Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2., Answers to Interrogatories, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Shet, #4 Category Form)(Nimock, Mario) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less