This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 08:03:30 (UTC).

Lorenzo Reyes v. Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Lorenzo Reyes filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00984

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lorenzo Reyes

Martha Reyes

Defendants

Does 1-10, inclusive

Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc.

Central Loan Administration and Reporting

U.S. Bank, N.A.

All Persons Unknown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dev Dilip Patel

Attorney at Saunders Law Group

1891 California Avenue Suite 102

Corona, CA 92881

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Bao

Attorney at Wolfe and Wyman LLP

2301 Dupont Drive Suite 300

Irvine, CA 92612-7531

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#12) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 7] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on July 30, 2021. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #7 filed by Defendants Central Loan Administration and Reporting, U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Bao, Andrew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE filed by defendants Central Loan Administration and Reporting, U.S. Bank, N.A.. re Issuance of Standing Order (Bao, Andrew) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #7 (Bao, Andrew) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by defendants Central Loan Administration and Reporting, U.S. Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Bao, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Central Loan Administration and Reporting, U.S. Bank, N.A., served on Notice to Adverse Parties re Removal. (Bao, Andrew) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants All Persons Unknown, Central Loan Administration and Reporting, Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc., Does 1-10, inclusive, U.S. Bank, N.A. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Martha Reyes, Lorenzo Reyes. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/26/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 (ghap) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Bao, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., (Bao, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2102096 Receipt No: ACACDC-31452308 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint) (Attorney Andrew Bao added to party U.S. Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Bao, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL LOAN ADMINISTRATION AND REPORTING is a litigant

Latest cases where Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc Asset-Backed Pas is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew A. Bao