This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2019 at 08:19:38 (UTC).

Lord v. Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Lord filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Catherine M. Salinas and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02352

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Catherine M. Salinas

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shyanne Lord

Defendants

Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority

Ayodele Adenrele

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Eric Wolfe

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shyanne Lord. Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority waiver mailed on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Wolfe, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shyanne Lord. Ayodele Adenrele waiver mailed on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Wolfe, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Shyanne Lord. (Wolfe, Steven) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ayodele Adenrele. (eop) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (eop). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority. (eop) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Shyanne Lord. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8682423) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shyanne Lord. Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority waiver mailed on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Wolfe, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shyanne Lord. Ayodele Adenrele waiver mailed on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Wolfe, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Shyanne Lord. (Wolfe, Steven) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Ayodele Adenrele. (eop) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (eop). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority. (eop) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Shyanne Lord. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8682423) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less