This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2021 at 09:19:54 (UTC).

Lopez-Vargas et al v. Doctors Center Hospital Bayamon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Lopez-Vargas filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Doctors Center Hospital Bayamon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Francisco A. Besosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01284

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Francisco A. Besosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIGUEL ANGEL LOPEZ-VARGAS

JOSE RAFAEL LOPEZ-VARGAS

MILAGROS DEL PILAR LOPEZ-VARGAS

Defendants

DOCTORS CENTER HOSPITAL BAYAMON, INC.

SINDICATO DE ASEGURADORES PARA LA SUSCRIPCIN CONJUNTA DE SEGURO DE RESPONSABILIDAD PROFESIONAL MDICO-HOSPITALARIA

Members of the Estate of Jesus Lopez-Vargas

DR. ANDRES AVILA-GONZALEZ CONJUGAL LEGAL PARTNERSHIP

GRUPO DE EMERGENICAS VRC, CSP

UNKOWN CORPORATIONS X, Y & Z

PUERTO RICO MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE COMPANY

DR. ANDRES AVILA-GONZALEZ

CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY

DALE UNDERWRITING PARTNERS NATIONAL & FIRE MARINE

UNKOWN INSURANCE COMPANIES A, B, & C

Conjugal Partnership Avila-Doe

Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Segura de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria

Unknown Corporations X, Y & Z

Unknown Insurance Companies A, B & C

Continental Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philippe O. Beauchamp-Oliveras

Attorney at Beauchamp-Oliveras Law Office

1607 Ponce De Leon Ave., Cobian Plaza Bldg. Suite 304

San Juan, PR 00909

Defendant Attorneys

Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas

Attorney at RC Law and Litigation Services PSC

Doral Bank Building, Suite 801, Resolucion #33

San Juan, PR 00920-5604

Roselli Ciena-Malave

33 Calle Resolucion, Suite 802

San Juan, PR 00920

Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso

Attorney at Benito I. Rodriguez Masso Law Office

407 Calle Bonafoux

San Juan, PR 00918-3023

 

Court Documents

26 #3

Exhibit Proof of Mail

26 #2

Exhibit Published Summons

26 #1

Exhibit Newspaper Affidavit

#26

#25

24 #1

Summons

#24

#23

19 #2

Summons

1 #10

Summons Summons Dr. Avila Conj. Part.

1 #9

Summons Summons Dale

1 #7

Summons Summons SIMED

1 #6

Summons Summons PRMDIC

1 #5

Summons Summons Dr. Avila

1 #4

Summons Summons GEVRC

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet Category Sheet

#1

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER re #26 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/10/2021. (brc) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Motion In Compliance as to #23 Order filed by Philippe O. Beauchamp-Oliveras on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Newspaper Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Published Summons, #3 Exhibit Proof of Mail)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Beauchamp-Oliveras, Philippe) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Roselli Ciena-Malave on behalf of Defendant Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company as insurer of Grupo De Emergenicas VRC, CSP .(Ciena-Malave, Roselli) Modified on 8/9/2021 (ab). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Summons by Publication as to The Members of the Estate of Jesus Lopez-Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Summons By Publication) (ad) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION re #19 Motion in Compliance. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/23/2021. (brc) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER re #21 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/22/2021. (brc) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Motion In Compliance as to 20 Order on Motion In Compliance, filed by Philippe O. Beauchamp-Oliveras on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Writ for Summons by Publication)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Beauchamp-Oliveras, Philippe) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER re #19 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. The Court will not issue the order for service by publication until a proposed writ is tendered, as was previously ordered. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/15/2021. (brc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Motion In Compliance as to 18 Order on motion to clarify, filed by Philippe O. Beauchamp-Oliveras on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Summons)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Beauchamp-Oliveras, Philippe) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER re #15 Motion to clarify: NOTED. There is nothing to clarify; the order is clear. Plaintiffs will tender a proposed order authorizing service of process by publication on the defendant Members of the Estate of Jesus Lopez-Vargas, and a writ no later than July 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/14/2021. (brc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 11, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Miguel Angel Lopez-Vargas, Milagros Del Pilar Lopez-Vargas, Jose Rafael Lopez-Vargas filed by Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas on behalf of Continental Insurance Company, Doctors Center Hospital Bayamon, Inc. Responses due by 7/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ruiz-Comas, Roberto) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Service by Publication as to Members of the Estate of Jesus Lopez-Vargas filed by Philippe O. Beauchamp-Oliveras on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statement Under Penalty of Perjury, #2 Exhibit Death Certificate, #3 Summons Summons by Publication, #4 Exhibit Returned Mail)(Beauchamp-Oliveras, Philippe) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline is extended until August 6, 2021. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/06/2021. (brc) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the complaint filed by Roselli Ciena-Malave on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 7/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ciena-Malave, Roselli) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Andres Avila-Gonzalez served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021; Continental Casualty Company served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Conjugal Partnership Avila-Doe served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021; Dale Underwriting Partners National & Fire Marine served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021; Doctors Center Hospital Bayamon, Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021; Grupo De Emergenicas VRC, CSP served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Beauchamp-Oliveras, Philippe) Modified on 6/28/2021 to correct party served (ab). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Sindicato de Aseguradores para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Segura de Responsabilidad Profesional Medico-Hospitalaria served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Beauchamp-Oliveras, Philippe) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon PUERTO RICO MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Beauchamp-Oliveras, Philippe) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ANDRES AVILA-GONZALEZ, CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Conjugal Partnership Avila-Doe, DALE UNDERWRITING PARTNERS NATIONAL & FIRE MARINE, DOCTORS CENTER HOSPITAL BAYAMON, INC., GRUPO DE EMERGENICAS VRC, CSP, PUERTO RICO MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE COMPANY, SINDICATO DE ASEGURADORES PARA LA SUSCRIPCIN CONJUNTA DE SEGURO DE RESPONSABILIDAD PROFESIONAL MDICO-HOSPITALARIA (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7340111.), filed by MIGUEL ANGEL LOPEZ-VARGAS, JOSE RAFAEL LOPEZ-VARGAS, MILAGROS DEL PILAR LOPEZ-VARGAS. Service due by 9/13/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons DCH, #4 Summons Summons GEVRC, #5 Summons Summons Dr. Avila, #6 Summons Summons PRMDIC, #7 Summons Summons SIMED, #8 Summons Summons Continental, #9 Summons Summons Dale, #10 Summons Summons Dr. Avila Conj. Part.)(Beauchamp-Oliveras, Philippe) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE UNKOWN HEIRS AT LAW OF LOUIS BLAKEMORE is a litigant

Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico Medical Defense is a litigant