This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 09:21:39 (UTC).

Lopez v. Sam's East, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Lopez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sam's East, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lurana S. Snow, William P. Dimitrouleas and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60780

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

Referral Judges

Lurana S. Snow

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miriam C Lopez

Defendant

Sam's East, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Castile Ruggiero

Attorney at William C Ruggiero

200 S Andrews Ave, Suite 703

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Christine Michelle Manzo

Attorney at Liebler, Gonzalez & Portuondo, P.A.

44 W Flagler Street, Suite 2500

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Amended State Court Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

State Court Complaint

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #6

State Court Answer and Affirmative Defense

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (bms) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/5/2023 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 6/2/2023 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judge Snow for Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven R Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 10/10/2022 at 10:00 a.m.. (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Miriam C Lopez (Ruggiero, William) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's East, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Corporate Parent Sam's West, Inc. for Sam's East, Inc. (Manzo, Christine) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's East, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Corporate Parent Sam's West, Inc. for Sam's East, Inc. (Manzo, Christine) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Miriam C Lopez (Ruggiero, William) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven R Jaffe as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 10/10/2022 at 10:00 a.m.. (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/5/2023 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 6/2/2023 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judge Snow for Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (bms) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Sam's East, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manzo, Christine) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15582172, filed by Sam's East, Inc. Answer filed in State Court/ No Motion to Dismiss filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit D)(Manzo, Christine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2022: #6 State Court Answer and Affirmative Defense) (mab). Modified documents and Text on 4/22/2022 (mab). (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sam's East, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Michelle Manzo