This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2020 at 11:05:46 (UTC).

Lopez v. R&R Express Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Lopez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against R R Express Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00799

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Mejia Lopez

Defendants

R&R Express Inc

American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas

Edward Daniel Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark A Shores

Attorney at Mark Shores PLLC

P O Box 2955

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

Timothy B Hummel

500 W Main St, Suite 204

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Dan S Folluo

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable

Po Box 21100

Tulsa, OK 74121-1100

Austin T Jackson

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable

Po Box 21100

Tulsa, OK 74121-1100

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy B Hummel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hummel, Timothy) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Edward Daniel Davis, R&R Express Inc. (Jackson, Austin) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7 Docket Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Combined Answer of R&R Express, Inc. and Edward Daniel Davis

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance Austin T. Jackson

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance Dan S. Folluo

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Defendant Edward Daniel Daviss Special Reservation of Additional Time

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Defendant R&R Express Inc.s Special Reservation of Additional Time

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2664 filed by R&R Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant R&R Express Inc.s Special Reservation of Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, #3 Exhibit 3 Defendant Edward Daniel Daviss Special Reservation of Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance Dan S. Folluo, #5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance Austin T. Jackson, #6 Exhibit 6 - Combined Answer of R&R Express, Inc. and Edward Daniel Davis, #7 Exhibit 7 Docket Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy B Hummel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hummel, Timothy) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Edward Daniel Davis, R&R Express Inc. (Jackson, Austin) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3226873. (Folluo, Dan) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2664 filed by R&R Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant R&R Express Inc.s Special Reservation of Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, #3 Exhibit 3 Defendant Edward Daniel Daviss Special Reservation of Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance Dan S. Folluo, #5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance Austin T. Jackson, #6 Exhibit 6 - Combined Answer of R&R Express, Inc. and Edward Daniel Davis, #7 Exhibit 7 Docket Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less